Secrest v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James B. Secrest
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00113
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: GUERNSEY
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 the parties' Joint Motion for Relief from Judgment. The Commissioner's final decision is reversed, and this case is remanded for further administrative proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/24/2017. (dh1)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER adopting 29 the Magistrate Judge's 09/28/2017 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff waived his right to file an objection to the Report and Recommendation. The Court grants 28 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Indicative Ruling on a Motion for Relief from Judgment, and indicates that it is inclined to grant relief from its March 27, 2017 judgment entry should the Court of Appeals remand for that purpose. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 09/29/2017. (dh1)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS granting 28 Motion for an Indicative Ruling on a Motion for Relief that is Barred by a Pending Appeal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1(A)(3). Objections to R&R due by 10/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/28/2017. (ew)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 19 the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. The Plaintiff's Objections 20 to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation is overruled. Judgment is entered in favor of the Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/27/2017. (dh1)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 4 Complaint filed by James B. Secrest in that it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Statement of Errors be OVERRULED and judgment be entered in favor of the Commissioner. Objections to R&R due by 1/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/6/17. (sem)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Secrest v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Secrest
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Represented By: Jason M Mauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?