Clark v. Ohio Adult Parole Authority et al
Plaintiff: Leodius Clark
Defendant: Ohio Adult Parole Authority and Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction
Case Number: 2:2016cv00204
Filed: March 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: BELMONT
Presiding Judge: James L. Graham
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER - denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 5/10/2017. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that (16 in 2:16-cv-00204-JLG-KAJ) Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED, that (4 in 2:16-cv-00413-JLG-KAJ, 19 in 2:16-cv-00204-JLG-KAJ, 5 in 2:16-cv-00414-JLG-KAJ) Motion to Amend be < b>DENIED, that (18 in 2:16-cv-00204-JLG-KAJ) Motion to Stay Proceedings be DENIED, and that this consolidated action be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 2/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/6/2017. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00204-JLG-KAJ, 2:16-cv-00413-JLG-KAJ, 2:16-cv-00414-JLG-KAJ (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Leodius Clark. It is RECOMMENDED that the motion be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 3/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/10/2016. (pes)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Ohio Adult Parole Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leodius Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Adult Parole Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?