O'Connor v. Nationwide Children's Hospital
Plaintiff: Erin O'Connor
Defendant: Nationwide Children's Hospital
Case Number: 2:2016cv00357
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ROSS
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and granting 23 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 7/20/17. (sem)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 21 Motion for Reconsideration re 10 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 6/14/2017. (agm)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Deavers' chambers to establish a pretrial schedule and to schedule a settlement conference. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 11/9/2016. (kk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor v. Nationwide Children's Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Terrence Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Children's Hospital
Represented By: Cory D Catignani
Represented By: Daniel J Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?