Sabo v. Warden London Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Larry Sabo
Respondent: Warden London Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2016cv00536
Filed: June 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ATHENS
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; OVERRULING Petitioner's Objection and GRANTING Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/5/2017. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is RECOMMENDED that Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 15 ) be granted and that this action be dismissed. Petitioner's Motion to Renew (ECF No. 20 ) is DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 12/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/15/2016. (pes)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 10 Motion ; denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 12 Motion to Certify Class; denying 13 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/18/16. (kn)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabo v. Warden London Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Sabo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden London Correctional Institution
Represented By: Maura O'Neill Jaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?