CSX Transportation Inc v. Columbus Downtown Development Corporation et al
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation Inc
Defendant: Columbus Downtown Development Corporation, Messer Construction Co. and The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00557
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: James L. Graham
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 OPINION AND ORDER granting 239 , 240 and 242 Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/22/2019. (ew)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and taking under advisement in part 219 and 244 Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/5/2019. (ew)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 OPINION AND ORDER granting 159 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, 166 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order: Fact Discovery due by 1/15/2019, Primary Expert due by 3/1/2019, Rebuttal Expert due by 4/15/2019, Expert Discovery due by 6/15/2018, Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2019, Joint Status Report re Discovery due by 10/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/28/2018. (ew)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 OPINION AND ORDER finding as moot 45 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; finding as moot 58 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; finding as moot 67 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 93 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 94 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 112 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 113 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 3/26/2018. (ds)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/21/2017. (ew)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation Inc v. Columbus Downtown Development Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation Inc
Represented By: Brandon Lee Abshier
Represented By: Jeffrey D Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Downtown Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Messer Construction Co.
Represented By: Jane Michele Lynch
Represented By: Fredric L Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?