Miami Valley Fair Housing Center Inc et al v. Metro Development LLC et al
Plaintiff: Miami Valley Fair Housing Center Inc and Central Ohio Fair Housing Association
Defendant: Metro Development LLC, Integrated Partners Development Company LLC, Oxford Circle Development LLC, Triangle Properties Development LLC, Ardent Property Management, Inc., SBA Studios LLC, Albany Landings LLC, Four Pointe LLC, Northpark Place LLC, Remington Woods LLC, The Monroe House LLC, The Residences at Central Park LLC, The Woods at Perry Lane LLC, Winchester Park LLC, Jane and John Does 1-100 and Doe, Inc. 1-50
Case Number: 2:2016cv00607
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 146 Motion for Judgment of Dismissal. The case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/20/2018. (cmw)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion in Limine. Defendants' request for permission to use the report and videos at trial is DENIED. Defendants request for leave to retain a new expert is GRANTED. Defendants have three moths from the issuances of this Order to secure an expert and disclose a report.. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/29/2018. (cmw)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 3/7/2018. (mas)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER denying 89 Plaintiffs' Appeal from the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel ; granting 95 Defendants' Motion to Strike ; denying 96 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 1/25/18. (sem)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 108 Motion for Leave to File Video Exhibits Manually. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/6/2017. (ew)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 68 Motion to Stay. The parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer regarding a potential case schedule. The parties are then DIRECTED to submit that proposed schedule via email by 3/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/9/2017. (agm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miami Valley Fair Housing Center Inc et al v. Metro Development LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miami Valley Fair Housing Center Inc
Represented By: Stephen M Dane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Ohio Fair Housing Association
Represented By: Jamie L Crook
Represented By: Stephen M Dane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Development LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Partners Development Company LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Circle Development LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triangle Properties Development LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardent Property Management, Inc.
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBA Studios LLC
Represented By: Frederick T. Bills
Represented By: David Tehan Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany Landings LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Pointe LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northpark Place LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Woods LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Monroe House LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Residences at Central Park LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Woods at Perry Lane LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester Park LLC
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Matthew Scott Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe, Inc. 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?