Burgess v. Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail et al
Plaintiff: Burgess and Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess
Defendant: Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail, State of Ohio, Warden Jeremy Tolson, Jeremy Berwanger, John Bateman, Richard Losey, Robert Woodgeard, John/Jane Doe #2, John/Jane Doe #3, John/Jane Doe #4, John/Jane Doe #5, John/Jane Doe #6 and John/Jane Doe #1
Case Number: 2:2016cv00903
Filed: September 20, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ATHENS
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2018 Filing 70 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Dismiss Defendants: Jeremy Tolson, Jeremy Berwanger, and John Bateman terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/12/2018. (ew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS JEREMY TOLSON, JEREMY BERWANGER AND JOHN BATEMAN, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO CIV.R. 21 by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER STAYING CASE for 45 days, denying as moot without prejudice #66 Motion for Order Requiring Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections to Disclose the Address and Phone Number of Gerald D. Rutter. Joint Status Report re mediation outcome due via email by 8/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/11/2018. (ew)
July 9, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION for Disclosure FOR ORDER REQUIRING OHIO DEPARTMENT OF REHABILITATION AND CORRECTIONS TO DISCLOSE THE ADDRESS AND PHONE NUMBER OF GERALD D. RUTTER by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Offender Details, #2 Exhibit Email stating no objection from opposing counsel) (Malek, Nader)
June 6, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT LOSEY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO CIV.R. 21 by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - Granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. Discovery due by 7/30/2018. Dispositive motions due by 11/5/2018. Primary Expert due by 8/3/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 9/14/2018. Settlement week ready by December, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on June 5, 2018. (jlk)
June 4, 2018 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/4/2018. OF ALL DATES by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)
February 22, 2018 Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Settlement Week 9/2018. (jr)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: This case has been previously identified as ready for mediation during the Court's March Settlement Week. Counsel are ORDERED to confer re the readiness of their case for Settlement Week and contact Courtroom Deputy Jessica Rector by 2/12/2018 to adviser her if the case should not be set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/6/2018. (ew)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part #60 Motion for Extension of Time: Discovery due by 5/29/2018, Primary Expert due by 6/4/2018, Rebuttal Expert due by 7/16/2018, Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2018, Settlement Demand due by 4/3/2018, Response to Settlement Demand due by 4/23/2018. This case is referred to the September 2018 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/1/2018. (ew) Modified text on 2/1/2018 (ew).
January 31, 2018 Filing 60 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 6/30/2018. Joint Motion for Extension of All Dates by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: The Court finds the parties in this action are entitled to Richard E. Loseys ODRC institutional file as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/17/2018. (ew)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: The Court finds the parties in this action are entitled to Robert S. Woodgeards ODRC institutional file as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/17/2018. (ew)
January 8, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Status Conference held on 1/8/2018. (jr)
December 29, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess of Proof of Service of Subpoena on ODRC (Malek, Nader)
December 29, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/8/2018 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Counsel are directed to join together on one line and call the Court. (jr)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/22/2017. (ew)
December 21, 2017 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)
December 15, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess Notice of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel Sara Gedeon (Gedeon, Sara)
December 15, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess Notice of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel David B. Malik (Malik, David)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying without prejudice #50 Motion for a Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/14/2017. (ew)
December 11, 2017 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Robert Woodgeard. Robert Woodgeard served on 12/6/2017, answer due 12/27/2017. See Doc. #51 for the document. (daf)
December 8, 2017 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Robert Woodgeard on 12/06/2017, filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)
December 6, 2017 Filing 50 MOTION Joint Motion for Stipulated Protective Order by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)
December 4, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess of Proof of Service of Subpoena on Adult Parole Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Malek, Nader)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #46 , #47 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/4/2017. (ew)
December 1, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malik, David)
December 1, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Gedeon, Sara)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part #44 Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiff is ORDERED to perfect service or obtain a waiver as to Defendant Woodgeard within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/20/2017. (ew)
November 17, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/17/2018. MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Malek, Nader)
October 30, 2017 Filing 43 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint, filed by Richard Losey. (Cooke, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2017 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Richard Losey on 10/26/2017, answer due 12/26/2017. (Malek, Nader)
October 26, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ilgen Cooke for Defendant Richard Losey (Cooke, Elizabeth)
October 20, 2017 Filing 40 Summons Issued as to Richard Losey. (daf)
October 20, 2017 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: Copy of the Amended Complaint and Issued Summons were sent via certified mail to Robert Woodgeard. (daf)
October 20, 2017 Filing 38 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (Malek, Nader)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re #35 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is allowed an extension of time to perfect service on both Defendants Woodgeard and Losey until 11/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/19/2017. (ew)
October 18, 2017 Filing 36 Summons Issued as to Robert Woodgeard. (ew)
October 17, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/19/2017. to Complete Service and Brief in Response to Court Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Malek, Nader)
October 17, 2017 Filing 34 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (Malek, Nader)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause within 14 days why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and why an extension of time to effect service should be allowed. Magistrate Judge grants #32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time: Discovery due by 2/28/2018. Dispositive motions due by 6/4/2018. Primary Expert due by 3/5/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/16/2018. Plaintiff's Settlement Demand due by 1/3/2018; Defendants' Response due by 1/22/2018. This case is referred to the March 2018 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/11/2017. (ew)
October 10, 2017 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/28/2018. and all dates with proposed Order attached by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)
September 25, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Malik for Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess (Malik, David)
September 25, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Michelle Gedeon for Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess (Gedeon, Sara)
July 28, 2017 Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Settlement Week 12/2017. (jr)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Counsel is ORDERED to confer regarding the readiness of their case for Settlement Week. If all counsel concur that the case is not ready to set, they shall email Courtroom Deputy Jessica Rector by 8/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/27/2017. (ew)
April 30, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint, filed by John Bateman, Jeremy Berwanger, Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail, Jeremy Tolson. (Yosowitz, Andrew)
April 21, 2017 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Bateman, Jeremy Berwanger, John/Jane Doe #1, John/Jane Doe #2, John/Jane Doe #3, John/Jane Doe #4, John/Jane Doe #5, John/Jane Doe #6, Richard Losey, Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail, Jeremy Tolson, Robert Woodgeard, filed by Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (agm)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; finding as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #25 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/21/2017. (agm)
April 20, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/8/2017. to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Filed by State of Ohio, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 5/8/2017. ( Responses due by 5/11/2017) by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)
April 20, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess re #23 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, Instanter of No Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion fof Leave to File the First Amended Complaint, Instanter (Malek, Nader)
April 18, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, Instanter by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Malek, Nader)
April 7, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/7/2017. (agm)
March 31, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess (Malek, Nader)
March 29, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE by Defendants John Bateman, Jeremy Berwanger, Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail, Jeremy Tolson of Additional Counsel (Yosowitz, Andrew)
March 21, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess of Service of Initial Disclosures (Malek, Nader)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the September 2017 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Any Motions to Amend or to Join Additional Parties due by 6/30/2017. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 3/24/2017. Primary Expert due by 11/3/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 12/15/2017. Discovery due by 10/31/2017. Dispositive motions due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/15/17. (sem)
March 15, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Plaintiff's Response now due by 4/21/2017 per the 3/15/17 PPTC. (sem)
March 8, 2017 Filing 17 RULE 26(f) REPORT of the parties filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)
March 7, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Koppitch for Defendant State of Ohio (Koppitch, Nicole)
March 7, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant State of Ohio. (Pierce, Sarah)
March 7, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elaine Pierce for Defendant State of Ohio (Pierce, Sarah)
February 10, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2017 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Report) (jr)
February 2, 2017 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by John Bateman, Jeremy Berwanger, Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail, Jeremy Tolson. (Yosowitz, Andrew)
January 11, 2017 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to State of Ohio on 1/6/2017, answer due 3/7/2017. (Malek, Nader) Added text on 1/11/2017 (er).
January 11, 2017 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to State of Ohio on 1/6/2017, answer due 3/7/2017. (Malek, Nader) ***REMOVED by the Clerk, see corrective notice filed on 1/11/2017 (er).
January 11, 2017 Notice of Correction re 10 Waiver of Service Executed: The document entered by counsel belongs to a case out of Northern District of Ohio. Counsel informed the Clerk of error who then immediately filed the correct document- see #11 . (er)
January 6, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark David Landes for Defendants John Bateman, Jeremy Berwanger, Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail, Jeremy Tolson (Landes, Mark)
January 6, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Neil Yosowitz for Defendants John Bateman, Jeremy Berwanger, Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail, Jeremy Tolson (Yosowitz, Andrew)
January 6, 2017 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jeremy Tolson on 12/11/2016, answer due 2/9/2017. (Malek, Nader) Modified date sent and answer due on 1/6/2017 (er).
January 6, 2017 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail on 12/11/2016, answer due 2/9/2017. (Malek, Nader) Modified date sent and answer due on 1/6/2017 (er).
January 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail answer due 2/9/2017; Jeremy Tolson answer due 2/9/2017. (er)
January 3, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: John Bateman answer due 2/9/2017; Jeremy Berwanger answer due 2/9/2017; Robert Woodgeard answer due 2/9/2017. (er)
January 2, 2017 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to John Bateman on 12/11/2016, answer due 2/9/2017. (Malek, Nader) Modified text and answer due date on 1/3/2017 (er).
December 30, 2016 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Robert Woodgeard on 12/11/2016, answer due 2/9/2017. (Malek, Nader) Modified text and answer due date on 1/3/2017 (er).
December 30, 2016 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jeremy Berwanger on 12/11/2016, answer due 2/9/2017. (Malek, Nader) Modified text and modified answer due date on 1/3/2017 (er).
September 20, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess (Malek, Nader) Modified on 9/21/2016 to correct text (kk)
September 20, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5662901), filed by Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess. (Malek, Nader)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Ohio Regional Jail
Represented By: Mark David Landes
Represented By: Andrew Neil Yosowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio
Represented By: Sarah Elaine Pierce
Represented By: Nicole M. Koppitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jeremy Tolson
Represented By: Mark David Landes
Represented By: Andrew Neil Yosowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Berwanger
Represented By: Mark David Landes
Represented By: Andrew Neil Yosowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bateman
Represented By: Mark David Landes
Represented By: Andrew Neil Yosowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Losey
Represented By: Elizabeth Ilgen Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Woodgeard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Dean'Dre Burgess
Represented By: Nader Nabil Malek
Represented By: David B Malik
Represented By: Fernando O Mack
Represented By: Sara Michelle Gedeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?