Greif International Holding B.V. v. Mauser USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Greif International Holding B.V.
Defendant: Mauser USA, LLC and National Container Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01198
Filed: December 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and NOTICE of Dismissal by All Parties. (Shunk, Thomas) Modified on 5/23/2017 (er).
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice Regarding Settlement in Principle by Defendants Mauser USA, LLC, National Container Group, LLC (Murray, Joseph)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 5/18/2017. (ds)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Damages Pending a Finding of Liability filed by Defendants Mauser USA, LLC, National Container Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5) (Murray, Joseph)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Damages Pending a Finding of Liability filed by Plaintiff Greif International Holding B.V.. (Shunk, Thomas)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/10/17. (sem)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Greif International Holding B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order) (Shunk, Thomas)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - the Court orders expedited briefing on #15 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Damages Pending a Finding of Liability. Responses due by 4/10/2017, Replies due by 4/17/2017. Further, the Court ORDERS that discovery concerning liability shall commence and continue through the pendency of the Motion to Bifurcate and Stay Damages. The remainder of discovery, including discovery on the issues of damages and willfulness, shall be STAYED. Finally, the Court ORDERS the parties to contact this Court upon resolution of the Motion to Bifurcate and Stay Damages to schedule a Reconvened Preliminary Pretrial Conference to establish a case schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 03/30/17. (jlk)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/30/2017. (jr)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Damages Pending a Finding of Liability by Defendants Mauser USA, LLC, National Container Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Murray, Joseph)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Mauser USA, LLC, National Container Group, LLC. (Murray, Joseph)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Greif International Holding B.V.. (Shunk, Thomas)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Greif International Holding B.V.. (Shunk, Thomas)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference reset for 3/30/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for March 22, 2017 is RESCHEDULED to 10:00 a.m. on March 30, 2017. The conference shall take place by telephone, Mr. Shunk to initiate. (hh)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2017 02:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Report) (jr)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Russell E. Levine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/1/2017. (agm)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5859998) of Russell E. Levine by Defendants Mauser USA, LLC, National Container Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Murray, Joseph)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph A. Loy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/28/17. (sem)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5858168) of Joseph A. Loy by Defendants Mauser USA, LLC, National Container Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Murray, Joseph)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Mauser USA, LLC, National Container Group, LLC. (Murray, Joseph)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Mauser USA, LLC, National Container Group, LLC. (Murray, Joseph)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to National Container Group, LLC on 12/27/2016, answer due 2/27/2017. (Shunk, Thomas)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Mauser USA, LLC on 12/27/2016, answer due 2/27/2017. (Shunk, Thomas)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Greif International Holding B.V., Greif, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Greif, Inc. for Greif International Holding B.V... (Shunk, Thomas)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for patent infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5777930), filed by Greif International Holding B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brochure, #2 Exhibit B - 702 Patent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shunk, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greif International Holding B.V. v. Mauser USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greif International Holding B.V.
Represented By: Thomas H Shunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mauser USA, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Loy
Represented By: Joseph F Murray
Represented By: Russell E Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Container Group, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Loy
Represented By: Joseph F Murray
Represented By: Russell E Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?