Hatfield v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Robin Hatfield
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00076
Filed: January 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 22 Report and Recommendations. The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. The Statement of Errors is OVERRULED, and the Commissioner of Social Securitys decision is AFFIRMED. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/23/2018. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs Statement of Errors be OVERRULED, and the Commissioner of Social Securitys decision be AFFIRMED regarding 3 Complaint filed by Robin Hatfield. Objections to R&R due by 2/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on January 22, 2018. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Complaint filed by Robin Hatfield. It isRECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Plaintiffs action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 8/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 21, 2017. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatfield v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Adam R Sorkin
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?