Lee et al v. Genesis Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Lee and Isabelle Lee
Defendant: Genesis Hospital, Andrew Guglielmi, William Wallis, Radiology Associates of S.E.O., Gensis FirstCare-South, Roland Long, Genesis Urgent Care Physicians LLC, John Doe Physicians #1-5, John Doe Nurses #1-5, John Doe Employees #1-5, John Doe Corporations #1-5 and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv00312
Filed: April 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: LICKING
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct Inadvertent Omission from the July 31, 2017 Order dismissing this action. The Clerk is directed to remand this case back to the Licking County Common Pleas Court for further proceedings as to the state court Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/22/2017. (dh1)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: This matter is before the Court upon Plaintiffs' Response to Show Cause 11 asserting that service to Defendants Dr. Guglielmi, Dr. Wallis, and Radiology Associates of SEO has been satisfied in the state court prior to the removal to fe deral court. Plaintiffs also assert they do not oppose dismissal of their complaint without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction for reasons set out in Defendant the United States' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. The Court therefore dismisses without prejudice the Complaint in its entirety for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/31/2017. (dh1)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 5 Defendant United States of America's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction for failure to exhaust administrative remedies under the Federal Tort Claims Act. The United States, having previously substituted itself as defendant for the Muskingum Valley Health Centers, Inc., Carl Schowengerdt, M.D., and Roger D. Ward, Jr., D.O., also clarifies that its notice of substitution and Motion to Dismiss is not intended to cover any incidents involving Roger D. Ward, Jr., which are alleged to have occurred after 07/31/13. The Clerk is DIRECTED to reactivate Mr. Ward as a Defendant in this case and the United States is DISMISSED from the case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 06/14/2017. (dh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Genesis Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Lee
Represented By: David I Shroyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabelle Lee
Represented By: David I Shroyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Hospital
Represented By: Robert B Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Guglielmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiology Associates of S.E.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gensis FirstCare-South
Represented By: Robert B Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Long
Represented By: Robert B Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Urgent Care Physicians LLC
Represented By: Robert B Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Physicians #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Nurses #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Employees #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mark Thomas D'Alessandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?