Howell v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: William J. Howell, Sr.
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2017cv00409
Filed: May 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: JACKSON
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; OVERRULING Plaintiff's Statement of Errors and AFFIRMING the Commissioner's Decision. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 4/5/2018. (cw)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS overruling Plaintiff's Statement of Errors and entering judgment in favor of Defendant. Objections to R&R due by 3/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/9/2018. (ew)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS denying 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff be given ten (10) days from the date of the adoption of this Report and Recommendation to pay the appropriate filing fee. Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/26/2017. (ew)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Howell, Sr.
Represented By: Jay W Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?