Ellis v. Warden, Ross Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Terrille D. Ellis
Respondent: Warden, Ross Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2017cv00415
Filed: May 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ROSS
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 23 Report and Recommendations.This action is hereby DISMISSED as either without merit or as procedurally defaulted. The Court DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/11/2018. (cmw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terrille D. Ellis. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED . Objections to R&R due by 5/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/11/2018. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation on 08/16/17 that Respondent's Motion to Dismiss 5 be granted, that Petitioner's Motion to Stay 6 be denied, and that this action be dismissed. Petitioner objected to that recommendation 14 . In light of new information provided by Petitioner, Petitioner's Objection 14 is granted. The Court declines to adopt the Report and Recommendation {8]. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust 5 is denied. Petitioner's Motion to Stay 6 is denied. Respondent is directed to file a response to the Petition in accordance with the Rules Governing § 2254 cases in the United States District Courts within 45 days. Petitioner may have 14 days to file a traverse. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/17/2017. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Warden, Ross Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrille D. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Ross Correctional Institution
Represented By: Mary Anne Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?