Ashdown v. 12th District Court of Appeals et al
Plaintiff: Brandon James Ashdown
Defendant: 12th District Court of Appeals, Haughey & Niehaus LLC, Butler County Courts, Government SERVICES Center, Caldwell Ohio Post Office and Noble Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2017cv00661
Filed: July 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: NOBLE
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M. Vascura
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 7 the Magistrate Judge's 09/08/17 Report and Recommendation and 11 the Magistrate Judge's 11/16/17 Supplemental Report and Recommendation. No objections have been filed to the Report and Recommendation or the Supplemental Report and Recommendation. The Court DISMISSES this action as frivolous and DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Amend as futile. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/13/2017. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DENY Plaintiff's 10 Motion for leave to File Amended Complaint and ADOPT the September 8, 2017 Report and Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 11/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/16/2017. (kpt)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 6 Complaint filed by Brandon James Ashdown. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. It is further RECOMMENDED that to the extent Plaintiff intended to bring any state-law claims, that the Court decline to exercise jurisdiction over those claims in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3) such that those claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to re-filing in state court. Response to objections must be filed within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/8/2017. (kdp)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashdown v. 12th District Court of Appeals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 12th District Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haughey & Niehaus LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler County Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government SERVICES Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caldwell Ohio Post Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon James Ashdown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?