O'Keefe v. LeGrand
Petitioner: Brian Kerry O'Keefe
Respondent: Robert LeGrand
Case Number: 2:2017cv00845
Filed: September 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION and ORDER adopting 32 the Report and Recommendation; denying 33 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 34 Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel; finding as moot Petitioner's Motions 26 , 27 and 28 . Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/31/17. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS dismissing 11 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Objections to R&R due by 10/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/4/2017. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 15 ) is granted in part with respect to the change of forum and denied in part with respect to all other requests. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court will transfer this acti on to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, Eastern Division, 85 Marconi Blvd., Room 121, Columbus, OH 43215. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court administratively close this action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Keefe v. LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Kerry O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert LeGrand
Represented By: Matthew S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?