Herman et al v. O'Keefe et al
Plaintiff: O'Keefe-Miller, LLC and Sandra J. Herman
Defendant: Karen A. Sturgeon and Brendan O'Keefe
Case Number: 2:2017cv01011
Filed: November 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Judgment Filed in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Judgment Issued. (daf)
March 4, 2019 Filing 27 DEFAULT JUDGMENT (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION and ORDER denying as moot #17 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Sturgeon; granting #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/4/19. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 31, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Herman, O'Keefe-Miller, LLC. Amendment to #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against Brendan O'Keefe Amended Proposed Default Judgment Against Brendan O'Keefe, Individually. (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
January 31, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Karen A. Sturgeon Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Herman, O'Keefe-Miller, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Dismissing Defendant Karen A. Sturgeon Without Prejudice) (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
December 4, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Status Conference held on 12/4/2018. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (jk)
November 30, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Herman, O'Keefe-Miller, LLC of Withdrawal and Substitution of Trial Attorney (Montgomery, Michael)
November 13, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing - Status Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 2:30 p.m. (counsel only) in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 6, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Set Aside Default Entry by the Clerk, #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Karen A. Sturgeon. (Burch, Christopher)
July 31, 2018 This entry was created by the Clerk's office for case management purposes to combine the event Reply to Response to Motion with the event Response in Opposition to Motion used in #21 . (ew)
July 31, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #18 Motion to Set Aside Default, #19 MOTION to Dismiss, and REPLY to Response to #17 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Herman, O'Keefe-Miller, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Quit Claim Deed, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Sandra J. Herman) (Montgomery, Michael) Modified text on 8/1/2018 (ew).
July 16, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Default Judgment against Karen Sturgeon filed by Defendant Karen A. Sturgeon. (Burch, Christopher)
July 10, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Karen A. Sturgeon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Copies) (Burch, Christopher)
July 10, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Set Aside Default Entry by the Clerk by Defendant Karen A. Sturgeon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Karen A. Sturgeon) (Burch, Christopher)
June 25, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment against Karen Sturgeon by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Herman, O'Keefe-Miller, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael J. Montgomery w/Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Sandra J. Herman, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Proposed Orders) (Montgomery, Michael)
June 25, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment against Brendan O'Keefe by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Herman, O'Keefe-Miller, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael J. Montgomery w/Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Sandra J. Herman, #3 Exhibit Proposed Orders) (Montgomery, Michael)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff shall have 60 days to conduct the necessary discovery. The Rule 26(f) Preliminary Pretrial Conference and Rule 26(a) initial disclosure requirements are STAYED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/15/2018. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 14, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Immediate Discovery, and to Stay the Parties' Planning Conference & Initial Disclosure Requirements (or the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference/Order Triggering Them), in Light of all Defendants' Default by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Herman, O'Keefe-Miller, LLC. (Montgomery, Michael)
March 12, 2018 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Brendan O'Keefe. (ew)
March 12, 2018 Filing 12 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Brendan O'Keefe Plaintiff's Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Brendan O'Keefe and Declaration in Support of Entry of Default. (Montgomery, Michael)
February 28, 2018 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Karen A. Sturgeon. (ew)
February 27, 2018 Filing 10 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Karen A. Sturgeon Plaintiff Sandra Herman's Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Karen A. Sturgeon and Declaration in Support of Entry of Default. (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendant O'Keefe's Motion for an Extension of Time, until 3/5/18, to move, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/13/18. (sem)
February 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brendan O'Keefe answer now due 3/5/2018. (sem)
February 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extention of Time by Defendant Brendan O'Keefe. (ew)
January 31, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Herman, O'Keefe-Miller, LLC. (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
January 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Brendan O'Keefe. Brendan O'Keefe served on 1/22/2018, answer due 2/12/2018. (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
January 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Karen A. Sturgeon. Karen A. Sturgeon served on 1/7/2018, answer due 1/29/2018. (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
January 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brendan O'Keefe and Karen A. Sturgeon. (ew)
January 4, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Summon In A Civil Action to Karen A. Sturgeon (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
January 4, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Summon In A Civil Action to Brendan O'Keefe (Hilsheimer, Lauren)
November 17, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND COMPLAINT against Brendan O'Keefe, Karen A. Sturgeon ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6210033), filed by Sandra J. Herman, O'Keefe-Miller, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Quit Claim Deed - 2008, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Montgomery, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herman et al v. O'Keefe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Keefe-Miller, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Montgomery
Represented By: Breaden M Douthett
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Herman
Represented By: Michael J Montgomery
Represented By: Breaden M Douthett
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen A. Sturgeon
Represented By: Christopher B Burch
Represented By: Christopher R Pettit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?