Schlueter v. Bethesda Healing Ministry
Plaintiff: Judith Schlueter
Defendant: Bethesda Healing Ministry
Case Number: 2:2017cv01055
Filed: December 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: James L. Graham
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M. Vascura
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION AND ORDER denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 12/6/2018. (ds)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER terminating 7 Motion to Dismiss; granting 8 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Attorney Thomas Arthur Gjostein terminated; granting 27 Motion for Leave to File; granting 31 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 11/21/18. (jlg6)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER adopting in part Report and Recommendations 11 , deferring recommendation as to dismissal, and allowing plaintiff 14 days from the date of this order to serve defendant. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 4/3/18. (jlg6)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is RECOMMENDED that Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure of Timely Service be GRANTED and that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Objections to R&R due by 4/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/26/2018. (kpt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlueter v. Bethesda Healing Ministry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Schlueter
Represented By: Thomas Arthur Gjostein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethesda Healing Ministry
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Kuhlman
Represented By: D Wesley Newhouse, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?