Aziz of the Family of Jalal v. Ohio Office of Child Support et al

Plaintiff: Aziz of the Family of Jalal
Defendant: Ohio Office of Child Support and Franklin County Child Support Enforcement Agency
Case Number: 2:2018cv00025
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M. Vascura
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 5/30/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 26, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER issued in that the 3/26/18 Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order is ADOPTED and AFFIRMED. Defendants' Motion to Vacate the Entries of Default are GRANTED and Plaintiff's Motions for Default Judgment are DENIED. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/26/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 26, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The Entries of Default (ECF No. 9) are VACATED. Plaintiff's Motions for Default Judgment (ECF Nos. 10 and 11) are DENIED. Defendants' Motions to Vacate (ECF Nos. 14 and 15) are GRANTED. Defendants ar e DIRECTED to file their answer/response to Plaintiff's Complaint WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/26/2018. (kpt)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aziz of the Family of Jalal v. Ohio Office of Child Support et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziz of the Family of Jalal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Office of Child Support
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Child Support Enforcement Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?