Pettus-Brown v. Adult Parole Authority et al
Plaintiff: La Shawn Pettus-Brown
Defendant: Adult Parole Authority, Ohio Parole Board, Ohio Dept. of Rehabilitation and Corrections and State Of Ohio
Case Number: 2:2018cv00082
Filed: January 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the 62 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION in that Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 5/9/19. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge grants 47 Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts, RECOMMENDS granting 40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and dismissing this case without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/2/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby DENIED. Plaintiffs Second Renewed Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Allotted Discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Response to Discovery Request is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 1/8/19. (sh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER: Magistrate Judge denies without prejudice 23 Second Renewed Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Allotted Discovery, denies as moot 33 Motion to Compel Response to Discovery Request, and RECOMMENDS denying [2 4] Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Objections to R&R due by 11/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/14/2018. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge grants 1 Motion for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis; RECOMMENDS dismissing 7 Complaint, denying as moot 6 Motion for Leave to Exceed Allotted Discovery. Objections to R&R due by 3/22/2018. Signed b y Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/15/2018. (ew)(This document has been forwarded to the Court's financial office in Columbus and sent by regular mail to the prison cashier's office, the Ohio Attorney General, and the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettus-Brown v. Adult Parole Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Shawn Pettus-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Parole Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Dept. of Rehabilitation and Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?