Sinkovitz v. Bryan Cook et al

Plaintiff: Paul Sinkovitz
Defendant: Bryan Cook and State Of Ohio
Case Number: 2:2018cv00210
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FAIRFIELD
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M. Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 6 in that Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/25/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 9, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's 8 Motion For Release From Prison In Order To Prosecute be DENIED. Plaintiff's motion includes a request for appointment of counsel, which is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to re-filing at a later stage of this case should the case progress beyond the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's current Objection. Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/9/2018. (kpt)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 28, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by Paul Sinkovitz in that it is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS this action pursuant to §1915(e)(2) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Objections to R&R due by 4/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/28/2018. (kpt)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinkovitz v. Bryan Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Sinkovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?