Keller v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Christina Keller
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv00341
Filed: April 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: DELAWARE
Referring Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees; The Parties Joint Stipulation for an Award of Attorneys Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act is accepted and the Commissioner shall pay Plaintiffs attorney fees in the amount of $1,937.50. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 2/26/19. (sh)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: the Court adopts and affirms the Report and Recommendations 16 ; The Commissioner of Social Securitys nondisability finding is hereby REVERSED and this case is REMANDED to the Commissioner and Administrative Law Judge pursuant to Sentence Four of § 405(g). Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 2/14/19. (sh)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS reversing the Commissioner's non-disability finding and remanding this case to the Commissioner. Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/28/2019. (ew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Keller
Represented By: Rachel C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?