Taylor v. Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Adam D. Taylor
Respondent: Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2018cv00447
Filed: May 7, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: JEFFERSON
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 7 in that this action is hereby DISMISSED. The Court DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 7/11/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: ORDER: The original Report and Recommendation 2 is WITHDRAWN. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended that this action be dismissed re 6 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed b y Adam D. Taylor. Objections to R&R due by 6/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on May 30, 2018. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and ORDER: GRANTING re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 5/22/2018. The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that this action be DISMISSED unless Petitioner resubmits his habeas petiti on by 5/22/2018, stating the basis for each of his claims for relief, and the factual grounds in support. Petition Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on May 8, 2018. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail along with a new 2254 packet to the Plaintiff as listed on the NEF) Modified text on 5/8/2018 (jlk).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adam D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?