United States of America for the use of Accent Glass and Aluminum, Inc. et al v. Brigadier Construction Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Accent Glass and Aluminum, Inc. and United States of America for the use of Accent Glass and Aluminum, Inc.
Defendant: Brigadier Construction Services LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00620
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brigadier Construction Services LLC answer due 9/12/2018. (jlk)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Leave to Plead by Defendant Brigadier Construction Services LLC. (Loftus, Nora)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Brigadier Construction Services LLC. Brigadier Construction Services LLC served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (jlk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. NO POSTAGE. (jlk)
July 30, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: Summons and the Amended Complaint sent via certified mail to Brigadier Construction Services, LLC (7017 2400 0000 0721 5499) and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (7017 2400 0000 0721 5505). (jlk)
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brigadier Construction Services LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed by United States of America for the use of Accent Glass and Aluminum, Inc., Accent Glass and Aluminum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Bond, #3 Exhibit C - Pay Application, #4 Summons Form - Brigadier Construction, #5 Summons Form - Travelers Casualty) (Gregory, Donald)
July 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Brigadier Construction Services LLC. Brigadier Construction Services LLC served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (jlk)
July 11, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 7/4/2018, answer due 7/25/2018. (er)
June 28, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: Summons and Complaint have been sent Certified mail to the Defendants. 7016 3010 0000 2254 1275 Brigadier Construction Services, LLC and 7016 3010 0000 2254 1039 Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (jlk)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brigadier Construction Services LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (sem)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Accent Glass and Aluminum, Inc.. (Gregory, Donald)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brigadier Construction Services LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6495334), filed by United States of America for the use of Accent Glass and Aluminum, Inc., Accent Glass and Aluminum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract, #2 Exhibit B - Bond, #3 Exhibit C - Application and Certificate for Payment, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Form - Brigadier Construction Services, #6 Summons Form - Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America) (Gregory, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use of Accent Glass and Aluminum, Inc. et al v. Brigadier Construction Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigadier Construction Services LLC
Represented By: Nora E. Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accent Glass and Aluminum, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Jerome Madigan
Represented By: Donald Wayne Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of Accent Glass and Aluminum, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Jerome Madigan
Represented By: Donald Wayne Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?