Jenkins v. Sullivan, et al.
Plaintiff: Thomas C. Jenkins
Defendant: Huntington Insurance, Inc., Mary Beth Sullivan and Todd D. Kilpatrick
Case Number: 2:2018cv00694
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the December, 2018 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Motions to Amend due by 2/15/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 9/20/2018. Primary Expert due by 2/1/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 3/1/2019. Discovery due by 3/30/2019. Any proposed protective order or clawback agreement shall be filed with the Court by 9/20/2018. Dispositive motions due by 3/15/2019. Settlement Demand due by 9/15/2018. Response to Settlement Demand due by 9/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on September 14, 2018. (jlk)
September 11, 2018 NOTICE - The 9/13/2018 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED. (See doc #15 .) (sln)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Thomas C. Jenkins. (Murray, Joseph)
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Strauss, Catherine)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Dfts' Motion for Extension of Time until 8/22/2018 to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/16/2018. (sln)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 8/22/2018. by Defendants Huntington Insurance, Inc., Todd D. Kilpatrick, Mary Beth Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Strauss, Catherine)
August 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Huntington Insurance, Inc. answer due 8/15/2018; Mary Beth Sullivan answer due 8/15/2018. (jlk)
August 9, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2018 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Huntington Insurance, Inc., Todd D. Kilpatrick, Mary Beth Sullivan. (Strauss, Catherine)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina S. Dahmann for Defendants Huntington Insurance, Inc., Todd D. Kilpatrick, Mary Beth Sullivan (Dahmann, Kristina)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine L Strauss for Defendants Huntington Insurance, Inc., Todd D. Kilpatrick, Mary Beth Sullivan (Strauss, Catherine)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notation Order: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sanjay Shivpuri is GRANTED, conditional upon registration for electronic filing with this Court, or seeking leave to be excused from doing so, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 2, 2018. (jlk)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Todd D. Kilpatrick. Todd D. Kilpatrick served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018. (Murray, Joseph)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6542634) of Sanjay Shivpuri by Plaintiff Thomas C. Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Indiana, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois) (Murray, Joseph)
July 24, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Huntington Insurance, Inc.. Huntington Insurance, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Murray, Joseph)
July 24, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Mary Beth Sullivan. Mary Beth Sullivan served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Murray, Joseph)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Huntington Insurance, Inc., Todd D. Kilpatrick, Mary Beth Sullivan. (jlk)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Huntington Insurance, Inc., Todd D. Kilpatrick, Mary Beth Sullivan ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6521278), filed by Thomas C. Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Sullivan, #3 Summons Form Kilpatrick, #4 Summons Form Huntington Insurance, Inc.) (Murray, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Sullivan, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine L Strauss
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Sullivan
Represented By: Catherine L Strauss
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd D. Kilpatrick
Represented By: Catherine L Strauss
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C. Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph F Murray
Represented By: Sanjay Shivpuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?