Opal's LLC v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Opal's LLC
Defendant: Target Corporation and Target Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00709
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time as to Target Corporation: Answer due 9/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/15/2018. (ew)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 9/21/2018. by Defendant Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Motley, Martha)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph J. Quigley is GRANTED , conditional upon registration for electronic filing with this Court, or seeking leave to be excused from doing so, within (14) days of date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/1/2018. (daf)
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6540267) of Joseph J. Quigley by Plaintiff Opal's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing) (Organ, Shawn)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Target Corporation. The Defendant was served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. (daf)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Parks is GRANTED , conditional upon registration for electronic filing with this Court, or seeking leave to be excused from doing so, within (14) days of date of this Order. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/30/2018. (daf)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M Feasel for Plaintiff Opal's LLC (Feasel, Joshua)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6536090) of Kevin C. Parks by Plaintiff Opal's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing) (Organ, Shawn)
July 25, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: Copy of the Complaint and Issued Summons were sent via certified mail to the named defendant. (daf)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Target Brands, Inc. and Target Corporation. (daf)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND (Verified) against Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6526634), filed by Opal's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons Form (Target Corp), #3 Summons Form Summons Form (Target Brands, Inc.)) (Organ, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Opal's LLC v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Martha Brewer Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Opal's LLC
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: Kevin Parks
Represented By: Joshua M Feasel
Represented By: Joseph J Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?