Ketchens et al v. Davol, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: William Ketchens and Patricia Parks
Defendant: Davol Inc and C R Bard Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00909
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 BRIEF by Defendants Bard Davol, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02846-EAS-KAJ et al. (Kloss, William)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:18-cv-80546. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Southern District of Ohio re: MDL 2846 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/21/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed pending a ruling by the JPML on the creation of a Bard hernia mesh MDL and on the transfer of this case to that MDL. This case shall be closed for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/6/2018. (bkd) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/21/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by C. R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc.. Responses due by 6/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Jacobson, Matthew) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/21/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C. R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for C. R. Bard, Inc. (Jacobson, Matthew) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/21/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D. Jacobson on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc.. Attorney Matthew D. Jacobson added to party C. R. Bard, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D. Jacobson added to party Davol, Inc.(pty:dft). (Jacobson, Matthew) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/21/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER for Magistrate Judge Bruce Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/16/2018. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/21/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Status Conference set for 3/27/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Jury Trial set for 4/29/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 4/24/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Order of Requirements, and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/15/2018. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/21/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C. R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc.. (rms1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/21/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (rms1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/21/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10605181, filed by William Ketchens. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gunn, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/21/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ketchens et al v. Davol, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol Inc
Represented By: Matthew D Jacobson
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Matthew D Jacobson
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ketchens
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Parks
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?