United States of America v. Forty-Eight Thousand Forty-One and 00/100 Dollars ($48,041.00) in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Forty-Eight Thousand Forty-One and 00/100 Dollars ($48,041.00) in United States Currency
Case Number: 2:2018cv00955
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Last publication date 10/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Publication) (Grimes, Deborah)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service on Sam Drumgoole) (Grimes, Deborah)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #3 Warrant Issued Return of Service: $48,041.00 in U.S. Currency in USMS custody (Grimes, Deborah)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued. (er)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for a Warrant of Arrest in Rem by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Warrant of Arrest In Rem) (Grimes, Deborah) Modified event and text on 9/6/2018 (er).
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem (Verified) against Forty-Eight Thousand Forty-One and 00/100 Dollars ($48,041.00) in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Grimes, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Forty-Eight Thousand Forty-One and 00/100 Dollars ($48,041.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forty-Eight Thousand Forty-One and 00/100 Dollars ($48,041.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deborah Diane Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?