United States of America v. Eleven Thousand Nine Hundred Eighty and 00/100 Dollars ($11,980.00) in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Seven Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($7,000.00) in United States Currency, Four Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($4,000.00) in United States Currency, Three Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($3,000.00) in United States Currency, Ten Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($10,000.00) in United States Currency, Eleven Thousand Nine Hundred Eighty and 00/100 Dollars ($11,980.00) in United States Currency, Three Thousand Five Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($3,500.00) in United States Currency and Nine Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($9,000.00) in United States Currency
Case Number: 2:2018cv01080
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Last publication date 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Publication) (Grimes, Deborah)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service: Kevin Feng) (Grimes, Deborah)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 9/26/2018. (er)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America Application to the Clerk of the Court for a Warrant of Arrest In Rem (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Warrant of Arrest In Rem) (Grimes, Deborah)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem (Verified) against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Grimes, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Eleven Thousand Nine Hundred Eighty and 00/100 Dollars ($11,980.00) in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($7,000.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($4,000.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($3,000.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($10,000.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleven Thousand Nine Hundred Eighty and 00/100 Dollars ($11,980.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Thousand Five Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($3,500.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nine Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($9,000.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deborah Diane Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?