Cockrell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carmalitta I. Cockrell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2018cv01124
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (jlk)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Julis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Julis, Rachel) Modified filer on 10/19/2018 (er).
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ew)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Carmalitta I. Cockrell. (ew)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Commissioner's certified copy of the Administrative Record, which shall serve as the answer, due within sixty (60) days after service. Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Commissioner's response due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Plaintiff may reply fifteen (15) days thereafter. If all parties consent to disposition of this case by the Magistrate Judge, parties should file their consents within thirty (30) days after service of the Administrative Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge) (ew)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karl E Osterhout is GRANTED , conditional upon registration for electronic filing with this Court, or seeking leave to be excused from doing so, within (14) days of date of this Order. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/28/2018. (daf)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Carmalitta I. Cockrell re #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6616129) of Karl E. Osterhout (Signed Copy of Motion) (Farrell, Clifford)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6616129) of Karl E. Osterhout by Plaintiff Carmalitta I. Cockrell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Farrell, Clifford)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Carmalitta I. Cockrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit USM form, #4 Exhibit USM form, #5 Exhibit USM form, #6 Summons Form US AG, #7 Summons Form OGC, #8 Summons Form US Attorney) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cockrell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmalitta I. Cockrell
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?