Air Force One, Inc. v. Air Source One, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Air Force One, Inc.
Defendant: Air Source One, L.L.C., Doug Dowler and Cheryl A. Dowler
Case Number: 2:2018cv01137
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/3/2018. (daf)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a status report on or before 12/3/2018, unless an appropriate stipulation of dismissal has been filed by that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 19, 2018. (jlk)
November 18, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Air Force One, Inc.. (Gallagher, Michael)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why the claims against Defendants should not be dismissed for want of prosecution WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order unless it has applied for an entry for an entry of default from the Clerk in the interim. Show Cause Response due by 11/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 31, 2018. (jlk)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Doug Dowler. Doug Dowler served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Gallagher, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Cheryl A. Dowler. Cheryl A. Dowler served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Gallagher, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Air Source One, L.L.C.. Air Source One, L.L.C. served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Gallagher, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Air Source One, L.L.C., Cheryl A. Dowler, and Doug Dowler. (daf)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6618904), filed by Air Force One, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Form Summons-Air Source One, L.L.C., #10 Summons Form Summons-Cheryl A Dowler, #11 Summons Form Summons-Doug Dowler) (Gallagher, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Air Force One, Inc. v. Air Source One, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Source One, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Dowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl A. Dowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Air Force One, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?