George et al v. Gree USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Raymond and Candace George, Raymond George and Candace George
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc., MJC America, LTD., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD. and GREE Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai
Case Number: 2:2018cv01212
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs Candace George, Raymond George. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Clark, William)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The Court VACATES the Pretrial Conference scheduled for December 6, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. and ADOPTS the following schedule: This case is referred to the June, 2019 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2019. Motions to Amend due by 2/1/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 12/20/2018. Primary Expert due by 5/1/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 6/15/2019. Discovery due by 9/1/2019. Any proposed protective order or clawback agreement shall be filed with the Court by 12/10/2019. Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2019. Settlement Demand due by 12/1/2018. Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 6, 2018. (jlk)
December 4, 2018 Notice : The 12/6/2018 at 10:00 AM Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED. (See ECF No. #16 .) (sln)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/30/2018. (sln)
November 29, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION - Stipulated Protective Order by Defendants GREE Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD., MJC America, LTD.. (Tarney, Tyler)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties by Defendants GREE Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD., MJC America, LTD.. (Tarney, Tyler)
November 21, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) filed by Defendants GREE Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD.. (Tarney, Tyler)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Candace George, Raymond George. (Clark, William) Modified text on 11/14/2018 (ew).
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) filed by Plaintiffs Candace George, Raymond George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Corporate Statement, #3 Exhibit SOS, #4 Exhibit Mingzhu testimony, #5 Exhibit Hoovers, #6 Exhibit Chen testimony, #7 Exhibit Cleland opinion, #8 Text of Proposed Order) (Clark, William)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTATION ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William N. Clark, Jr. conditional upon counsel registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/9/2018. (ew)
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6674004) of William N. Clark, Jr. by Plaintiffs Candace George, Raymond George. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William N. Clark, Jr., #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Avellano, Andrew)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 220 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) by Defendants GREE Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Tarney, Tyler)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Gree USA, Inc., MJC America, LTD.. (Tarney, Tyler)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Gree USA, Inc.. Gree USA, Inc. served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Clark, William)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant GREE Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai. GREE Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Clark, William)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant MJC America, LTD.. MJC America, LTD. served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Clark, William)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD.. Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD. served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Clark, William)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney William N. Clark, Jr. (ew)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gree USA, Inc.; MJC America, LTD.; GREE Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai; and Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD. (ew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6632793), filed by Raymond and Candace George. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Gree USA, Inc., #3 Summons Form Gree Electric, #4 Summons Form MJC, #5 Summons Form Hong Kong) (Avellano, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George et al v. Gree USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America, LTD.
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD.
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond and Candace George
Represented By: Andrew P. Avellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond George
Represented By: Andrew P. Avellano
Represented By: William N Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace George
Represented By: Andrew P. Avellano
Represented By: William N Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?