Mustric et al v. Huntington National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Owen Mustric
Defendant: Director Larry Hattix and Huntington National Bank
Case Number: 2:2018cv01279
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1971
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time: Amended Complaint due by 1/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/7/2018. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #3 Complaint by Plaintiff Thomas Owen Mustric. New date requested 1/5/2019. (er)
December 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Larry Hattix answer due 1/2/2019. (er)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Larry Hattix served on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (er) Modified served and answer dates on 12/4/2018 (er).
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Huntington National Bank. (Murch, Kevin)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Huntington National Bank served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (er)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Larry Hattix. (er)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Huntington National Bank. (er)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed by Thomas Owen Mustric(Trustee Helen L. Mustric Trust)& Thomas Owen Mustric(Individual) against Larry Hattix & Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-E) (er)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/24/2018. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Thomas Owen Mustric. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Exhibit D-E, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summonses to be Issued) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mustric et al v. Huntington National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Owen Mustric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Larry Hattix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Kevin L Murch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?