Abraham, Inc. et al. v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Abraham, Inc. and ARAIA BELAY ABRAHIM
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01306
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER: granting #3 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Limited Discovery. It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs may serve the proffered subpoena on Marathon for the purposes of obtaining Marathons electronic data from the period September 2017 to February 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 30, 2018. (jlk)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (er)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Discovery by Plaintiffs Abraham, Inc., Araia Belay Abrahim. (Burch, Christopher)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Burch, Christopher)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6653160), filed by Abraham, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Errata) (Burch, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abraham, Inc. et al. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B Burch
Represented By: Eric S Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARAIA BELAY ABRAHIM
Represented By: Christopher B Burch
Represented By: Eric S Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?