Crawford v. Black, et al.
Plaintiff: Shawn R. Crawford and Shawn Randall Crawford
Defendant: Phillip Black, State of Ohio Department of Medicaid, John Does 1-4, Indian River Transport Company, John Doe Corporation 1-4, Phillip Daniel Black, Ohio Department of Medicaid and Indian River Transport Co.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01310
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The Court VACATES the Pretrial Conference scheduled for November 29, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. and ADOPTS the following schedule: This case is referred to the December, 2019 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 2/11/2019. Motions to Amend due by 2/11/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 2/11/2019. Primary Expert due by 6/3/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 7/15/2019. Discovery due by 9/9/2019. Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2019. Any opposition shall be filed by 10/21/2019; any reply brief shall be filed by 11/4/2019. Settlement Demand due by 11/4/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 29, 2018. (jlk)
November 27, 2018 Notice: The 11/29/2018 at 11:00 AM Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED. (See ECF No. #9 .) (sln)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Phillip Daniel Black, Indian River Transport Co.. (Jurca, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Indian River Transport Co. (er)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2018 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Defendants Phillip Black, Indian River Transport Company of Proof of Rendering Notice of Removal to the State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal) (Jurca, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Phillip Black, Indian River Transport Company. (jlk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint and CROSSCLAIM against Phillip Black, John Doe Corporation 1-4, John Does 1-4, Indian River Transport Company filed by Department of Medicaid. (jlk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Phillip Black, Indian River Transport Company. (jlk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Shawn R. Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (jlk)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Franklin County, Ohio, case number 18CV09-8112, filed by Indian River Transport Company, Phillip Black. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer and Cross-Claim of Defendant State of Ohio Department of Medicaid, #3 Exhibit Answer of Defendants Black and Indian River Transport Co. to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit Answer of Defendants Black and Indian River Transport Co. to Cross-Claim, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Indian River Transport Co.) (Jurca, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-6654096 (kk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Black, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio Department of Medicaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian River Transport Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Daniel Black
Represented By: Beth Anne S Lashuk
Represented By: Sean P Casey
Represented By: Jeffrey John Jurca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Medicaid
Represented By: Robert Joseph Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian River Transport Co.
Represented By: Beth Anne S Lashuk
Represented By: Sean P Casey
Represented By: Jeffrey John Jurca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn R. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Randall Crawford
Represented By: Andrew Peter Schabo
Represented By: Robert Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?