In re: Edward Dudley, Sr.

Appellant: Mike DeWine
Appellee: Edward Dudley, Sr.
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Case Number: 2:2018cv01327
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Appellant Mike DeWine re #3 Appellant's Brief Appendix to Appellant's Brief (Marti, Todd)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Appellant's BRIEF by Appellant Mike DeWine. Appellee Brief due by 1/28/2019. (Marti, Todd)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/24/2018. . (Marti, Todd)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The parties briefing schedule will be established once the District Court receives the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Bankruptcy Court case number 2:15-bk-54258. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Opinion, #2 Partial Judgment, #3 Appeal Transmittal Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Edward Dudley, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mike DeWine
Represented By: Victoria D Garry
Represented By: Todd Robert Marti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Edward Dudley, Sr.
Represented By: Patricia B Fugee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: US Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?