Noble County, Ohio, by the Noble County Commissioners v. Cardinal Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Noble County, Ohio, by the Noble County Commissioners
Defendant: Brandon Worley, McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis LLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership II, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., CVS Indiana L.L.C., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Cephalon, Inc.,, Purdue Pharma Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01379
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
3 Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45096, filed 02/26/2019. (er)
February 7, 2019 Filing 44 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. re #43 Order on Motion to Stay (pb)
February 7, 2019 Case transferred to District of USDC Northern District of Ohio.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (pb)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Stay. This action is STAYED pending the JPML's decision on whether to transfer this case to the Opiate MDL. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 1/24/2019. (cmw)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting #41 Dft Brandon Worley's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due within 60 days after a Court's Ruling on Plaintiff's potential Motion to Remand or the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation's decision on a conditional transfer, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/27/2018. (sln) Modified text on 12/27/2018 (sln).
December 21, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Complaint New date requested 2/19/2019. by Defendant Brandon Worley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Fischer, David)
December 20, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by David T Fischer for Defendant Brandon Worley (Fischer, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION in re Section B (Matters Designated for Consideration without Oral Argument) of the attached Schedule MDL No. 2804. (er)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying #26 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/14/2018. (plb)
December 12, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Noble County, Ohio, by the Noble County Commissioners. (Vessels, Ethan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Murch, Kevin)
December 11, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Noble County, Ohio, by the Noble County Commissioners. (Vessels, Ethan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 34 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #32 Response to Motion by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Murch, Kevin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant CVS Indiana L.L.C.. (Phillips, Gregory)
December 3, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Murch, Kevin)
December 3, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Michael Buckley for Defendant Walgreen Co. (Buckley, Brent)
December 3, 2018 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation.. (Rhinehart, Erin)
December 3, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Clayton Hollon for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Hollon, Christopher)
December 3, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rhinehart for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Rhinehart, Erin)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - It is ORDERED that the default briefing schedule shall not apply to #26 Plaintiff's Emergency Omnibus Motion to Remand. Defendants' response due by 12/7/2018, Replies due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 30, 2018. (jlk)
November 29, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Noble County, Ohio, by the Noble County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Vessels, Ethan)
November 21, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Defendant CVS Indiana L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Phillips, Gregory)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - It is ORDERED that the deadline for the Manufacturer Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended by 60 days after a court's decision on Plaintiff's potential Motion to Remand or the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation's decision on a conditional transfer, whichever is later. filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 19, 2018. (jlk)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Extended 45 days from determination of removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 19, 2018. (jlk) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (jlk).
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Extended 30 days from determination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 19, 2018. (jlk) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (jlk).
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Connor B. O'Croinin is GRANTED , conditional upon registration for electronic filing with this Court, or seeking leave to be excused from doing so, within (14) days of date of this Order. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/19/2018. (daf)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #18 Dft Mylan Bertik Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer to Complaint due 60 days after the Court rules on Plaintiffs motion to remand (should one be filed) or the JPML issues a determination regarding transfer, whichever date is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/16/2018. (sln)
November 16, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Murch, Kevin)
November 16, 2018 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 1/14/2019. by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Murch, Kevin)
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kroger Limited Partnership II. (Kent, Robert)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Kent for Defendant Kroger Limited Partnership II (Kent, Robert)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:17-cv-662 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/15/18. (sem)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 1/14/2019. by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rice, Justin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Edward Rice for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Rice, Justin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J Laliberte for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Laliberte, Brian)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/13/2019. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Holzhall, Vincent)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Noble County CPC on 10/3/2018. (er)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Holzhall, Vincent)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/31/2018. to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Kroger Limited Partnership II. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kent, Robert)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6674717) of Conor B. O'Croinin by Defendant CVS Indiana L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Phillips, Gregory) Modified receipt number on 11/19/2018 (er).
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant CVS Indiana L.L.C identifying Corporate Parents CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and CVS Health Corporation. (Phillips, Gregory) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (ew).
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendant CVS Indiana L.L.C. to Plaintiffs of Removal to Federal Court (Phillips, Gregory)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant CVS Indiana L.L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Phillips, Gregory)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Noble County Court of Common Pleas, case number 218-0089 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6669509), filed by CVS Indiana L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Process, Pleadings, and Orders, #3 Exhibit 3 - Extensions) (Phillips, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble County, Ohio, by the Noble County Commissioners v. Cardinal Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Worley
Represented By: David T Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vincent I Holzhall
Represented By: Brian J Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Robert James Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Brent Michael Buckley
Represented By: Hunter Gordon Cavell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Represented By: Gregory J Phillips
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Clayton Hollon
Represented By: Erin Rhinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: Kevin L Murch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noble County, Ohio, by the Noble County Commissioners
Represented By: Ethan T Vessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?