Meigs County, Ohio v. Cardinal Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Meigs County, Ohio
Defendant: Donald Leathers, Brandon Worley, McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Actavis LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership II, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Allergan Finance LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., CVS Indiana L.L.C., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Laboratories, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Allergan PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis PLC and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01582
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
3 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45229, filed 04/11/2019. (sct)
April 3, 2019 Filing 34 Transfer Order - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (pb)
April 3, 2019 Case transferred to District of USDC Northern District of Ohio.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (pb)
April 2, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Defendant McKesson Corporation of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte (Laliberte, Brian)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Stay; denying #27 Motion to Remand; denying #28 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 1/25/2019. (cmw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Murch, Kevin)
January 15, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Meigs County, Ohio. (Vessels, Ethan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 29 State Court Record. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (daf)
January 7, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Meigs County, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Appendix Certificate of Service) (Vessels, Ethan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Murch, Kevin)
December 26, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Defendants CVS Indiana L.L.C., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Phillips, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.. (McLaughlin, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Murch, Kevin)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendants' Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Walgreen Co., and CVS Indiana LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/14/2018. (sln)
December 13, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.. (McLaughlin, Christopher)
December 13, 2018 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McLaughlin, Christopher)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/13/2018. (sln)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time for the Manufacturer Defendants to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/13/2018. (sln)
December 13, 2018 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/11/2019. by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Murch, Kevin)
December 13, 2018 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/11/2019. by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rice, Justin)
December 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Edward Rice for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Rice, Justin)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 Distributor Dfts' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/13/2018. (sln)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The judges agree that cases 2:17-cv-662 and 2:18-cv-1582 ARE related. Case 2:18-cv-1582 reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/11/2018. (ew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/13/2019. by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Holzhall, Vincent)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Michael Buckley for Defendant Walgreen Co. (Buckley, Brent)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J Laliberte for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Laliberte, Brian)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Holzhall, Vincent)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parents AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation and AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin) Modified text on 12/10/2018 (ew).
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Clayton Hollon for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Hollon, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rhinehart for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Rhinehart, Erin)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants originally filed in Meigs County Court of Common Pleas on 11/8/2018 by Meigs County, Ohio. (ew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants CVS Indiana L.L.C., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Indiana L.L.C... (Phillips, Gregory)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant CVS Indiana L.L.C. to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court (Phillips, Gregory)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Meigs County Court of Common Pleas, case number 18-cv-083 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6705942), filed by CVS Indiana L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.1 - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Complete Meigs County Docket, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Motions for Extension, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Phillips, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meigs County, Ohio v. Cardinal Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Leathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Worley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vincent I Holzhall
Represented By: Brian J Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Christopher Michael McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: James B Hadden
Represented By: Joseph F Murray
Represented By: Brian K Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Brent Michael Buckley
Represented By: Hunter Gordon Cavell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong
Represented By: Richard H Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Represented By: Gregory J Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Clayton Hollon
Represented By: Erin Rhinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: Kevin L Murch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meigs County, Ohio
Represented By: Ethan T Vessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?