Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Future Perfect Media, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music, Concord Music Group, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Lost Boys Music, Cyanide Publishing and EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Defendant: Benjamin E. DeRolph and Future Perfect Media, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01684
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 Future Perfect Media ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Future Perfect Media, LLC. (Griffith, D.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 D. DeRolph ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Benjamin E. DeRolph. (Griffith, D.)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Plt's Motion to Continue. Preliminary Pretrial Conference reset to 3/12/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/31/2019. (Previously set for 2/28/2019.) (sln)
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Lost Boys Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music. (Watchorn, Christine)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
January 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Benjamin E. DeRolph answer due 2/11/2019. (er)
January 25, 2019 Reset deadlines as to Future Perfect Media, LLC: Answer due 2/11/2019. (ew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION by Defendant Future Perfect Media, LLC. (Griffith, D.)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Future Perfect Media, LLC. Served on 1/7/2019. Answer due 1/28/2019. (ew)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: The complaint and issued summons were sent via certified mail to the Defendants. (ew)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Interior Music Corp.. (Watchorn, Christine)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff EMI Blackwood Music, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. (Watchorn, Christine) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (ew).
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Concord Music Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Eighth Note, Inc. (Watchorn, Christine) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (ew).
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Sony/ATV Songs LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. (Watchorn, Christine) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (ew).
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. (Watchorn, Christine) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (ew).
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Future Perfect Media, LLC and Benjamin E. DeRolph. (ew)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Benjamin E DeRolph, Future Perfect Media, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6717862), filed by Welsh Witch Music, Concord Music Group, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Lost Boys Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Future Perfect Media, LLC d/b/a Spacebar, #3 Summons Form Benjamin E. DeRolph) (Watchorn, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Future Perfect Media, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E Chudakoff
Represented By: Christine E Watchorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Robert E Chudakoff
Represented By: Christine E Watchorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Robert E Chudakoff
Represented By: Christine E Watchorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E Chudakoff
Represented By: Christine E Watchorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interior Music Corp.
Represented By: Robert E Chudakoff
Represented By: Christine E Watchorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lost Boys Music
Represented By: Robert E Chudakoff
Represented By: Christine E Watchorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyanide Publishing
Represented By: Robert E Chudakoff
Represented By: Christine E Watchorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E Chudakoff
Represented By: Christine E Watchorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin E. DeRolph
Represented By: D. Joe Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Perfect Media, LLC
Represented By: D. Joe Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?