Prinkey v. Carter Michaels and Associates, LLC, et al.

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Prinkey
Defendant: CARTER MICHAELS AND ASSOCIATES LLC, United Merchant Asset Recovery of WNY, LLC, Carter Michaels and Associates, LLC, John Does 1-10, United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC and Michael Enzinna
Case Number: 2:2019cv00468
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a written status report by APRIL 26, 2019, unless an appropriate order of dismissal has been received prior to that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 27, 2019. (jlk) Modified date signed on 3/27/2019 (jlk).
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement as to Entire Case by Plaintiff Jeffrey Prinkey (Hilton, Jonathan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CARTER MICHAELS AND ASSOCIATES LLC, Michael Enzinna, UNITED MERCHANT ASSET RECOVERY LLC, United Merchant Asset Recovery of WNY, LLC. (er)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #2 Motion to Expedite. GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion as it relates to serving a subpoena on Attorney Giove in order to obtain non-privileged emails relating to CMA and receipts from the payment platform Square relating to CMA for the time period November 1, 2018, to the present. GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion as it relates to his request to serve a subpoena on Google, LLC to discover subscriber information associated with the Gmail account cartermichaelsandassociates@gmail.com. DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Motion as it relates to his request to serve subpoenas on unidentified ISPs and telephone providers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 19, 2019. (jlk)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite Discovery to Ascertain the Identities of "John Doe" Defendants by Plaintiff Jeffrey Prinkey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New York Department of State Registration, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jonathan Hilton) (Hilton, Jonathan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6792920), filed by Jeffrey Prinkey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence from Carter Michaels and Associates LLC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form for Carter Michaels and Associates LLC, #4 Summons Form for United Merchant Asset Recovery LLC, #5 Summons Form for United Merchant Asset Recovery of WNY, #6 Summons Form for Michael Enzinna) (Hilton, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prinkey v. Carter Michaels and Associates, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Prinkey
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARTER MICHAELS AND ASSOCIATES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Merchant Asset Recovery of WNY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Michaels and Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Enzinna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?