Misty Valley Farm, Ltd. et al v. Gulfport Energy Corporation

Plaintiff: Catherine Miklowski and Misty Valley Farm, Ltd.
Defendant: Gulfport Energy Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00793
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Please note: The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (agm)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Young for Plaintiffs Catherine Miklowski, Misty Valley Farm, Ltd. (Young, Jeremy)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Misty Valley Farm, Ltd.. (Wigham, David)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Gulfport Energy Corporation. (McGranor, Timothy)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Gulfport Energy Corporation, filed by Misty Valley Farm, Ltd., Catherine Miklowski. (agm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corporation. (Batikov, Ilya)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County, Ohio Common Pleas Court, case number 2019-040 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6825320), filed by Gulfport Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Batikov, Ilya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misty Valley Farm, Ltd. et al v. Gulfport Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Miklowski
Represented By: David John Wigham
Represented By: Jeremy Young
Represented By: Patrick M. Hanley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Valley Farm, Ltd.
Represented By: David John Wigham
Represented By: Jeremy Young
Represented By: Patrick M. Hanley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfport Energy Corporation
Represented By: Ilya Batikov
Represented By: Timothy B McGranor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?