Hill v. Alden et al

Plaintiff: John Hill
Defendant: John/Jane Doe(s), T.B.D.B.I.T.L Alumni Club, OSU Marching Band and Eric R. Alden
Case Number: 2:2019cv01242
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
2 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the July 2, 2019 Opinion and Order, the Court ADOPTS and AFFIRMS the Report and Recommendation. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION and ORDER adopting and affirming #7 the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 7/2/2019. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff John Hill re #8 Objection to Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff attempted to service Mr. Eric R. Alden but mail was returned to sender "UNABLE TO FORWARD". (Attachments: #1 Env.) (jlk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff John Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ew)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6 Complaint filed by John Hill. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS this action for failure state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). ( Objections to R&R due by 5/9/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/25/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Eric R. Alden, John/Jane Doe(s), OSU Marching Band, and T.B.D.B.I.T.L Alumni Club, filed by John Hill. (daf)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is related to 2:17-cv-532, 2:17-mc-3, and 2:12-cv-984. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 4/9/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE DOCKET ANNOTATION: Judge Watson and Chief Magistrate Judge Deavers agree that this case and the following cases are related: 2:17-cv-532, 2:17-mc-3 and 2:12-cv-984. Judge Watson is the District Judge on all of the related cases and Magistrate Vascura is the Magistrate Judge assigned to the previously filed cases. As such, the Clerk's Office has been directed to reassign 2:19-cv-1242 to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura per Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John Hill. (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents.) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Forms, #10 USM-285 Forms) (ew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Alden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.B.D.B.I.T.L Alumni Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSU Marching Band
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric R. Alden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?