The Scotts Company LLC et al v. SBM Life Science Corp.

Plaintiff: The Scotts Company LLC and OMS Investments, Inc.
Defendant: SBM Life Science Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01275
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Gabrielides is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/27/2019. (daf)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Case is referred to Mediation in 5/2020; Initial Disclosures due by 6/26/2019; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 7/31/2019; Discovery due by 4/30/2020; Proposed Order re: ESI production due by 7/19/2019; Clawback Agreement due by 8/7/2019; Dispositive motions due by 7/1/2020; Primary Expert due by 2/28/2020; Rebuttal Expert due by 3/31/2020; Settlement Demand due by 4/3/2020; Response to Settlement Demand due by 4/10/2020; Defendants have until 3 months from the date of this Order to decide whether it will rely on opinions of counsel to rebut claim of willful infringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/26/2019. (kk2)
June 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/26/2019. (jr)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6982445) of John Gabrielides by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dirisamer, David)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Dolan and Joshua Frick are GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2019. (daf)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6977261) of Joshua Frick by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dirisamer, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6977180) of Christopher Dolan by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dirisamer, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Chang for Defendant SBM Life Science Corp. (Chang, Steven)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Dirisamer, David)
June 19, 2019 Notice of Correction: ECF No. 13 was filed inadvertently in the wrong case. The Document has been removed from the docket and filed in the correct case 2:19-cv-76. (daf)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Dirisamer, David)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTATION ORDER: The Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John F. Morrow, Jr., David R. Boaz, and Ana J. Friedman are GRANTED . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/6/2019. (daf)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-6953681) of David R. Boaz, John F. Morrow, Jr., and Ana J. Friedman by Defendant SBM Life Science Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court of North Carolina Certificate of Good Standing - David R. Boaz, #2 Exhibit Supreme Court of North Carolina Certificate of Good Standing - John F. Morrow, Jr., #3 Exhibit Supreme Court of North Carolina Certificate of Good Standing - Ana J. Friedman) (Perko, Acacia)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant SBM Life Science Corp.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by SBM Life Science Corp.. (Perko, Acacia)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2019 @ 2:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Acacia Marie Perko for Defendant SBM Life Science Corp. (Perko, Acacia)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SBM Life Science Corp.. (Hulme, Roy)
May 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: SBM Life Science Corp. answer due 6/5/2019. (daf)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION For Extension of Time by Defendant SBM Life Science Corp.. (Hulme, Roy)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SBM Life Science Corp.. (daf)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Dirisamer, David)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company identifying Corporate Parent The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company for OMS Investments, Inc... (Dirisamer, David)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs The Scotts Company LLC, The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company identifying Corporate Parent The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company for The Scotts Company LLC.. (Dirisamer, David)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against SBM Life Science Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6871325), filed by The Scotts Company LLC, OMS Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dirisamer, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Scotts Company LLC et al v. SBM Life Science Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Scotts Company LLC
Represented By: David J. Dirisamer
Represented By: Joshua Stewart Frick
Represented By: John T. Gabrielides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OMS Investments, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Dirisamer
Represented By: Christopher M. Dolan
Represented By: Joshua Stewart Frick
Represented By: John T. Gabrielides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBM Life Science Corp.
Represented By: David R. Boaz
Represented By: Ana J. Friedman
Represented By: John F. Morrow, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Chang
Represented By: Acacia Marie Perko
Represented By: Roy A Hulme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?