Bee Extremely Amazed, LLC v. BeeXtreme, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bee Extremely Amazed, LLC
Defendant: BeeXtreme, LLC and Toni M. Sweeney
Case Number: 2:2019cv01276
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant BeeXtreme, LLC (Frisina, Dominic) Modified on 6/25/2019 to correct filing party (kk2)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by Defendants BeeXtreme, LLC, Toni M. Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed 12(b) Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed 12(e) Order) (Frisina, Dominic) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (kk2)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Toni M. Sweeney on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Matasich, Michael)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Bee Extremely Amazed, LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Matasich, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Bee Extremely Amazed, LLC. (Matasich, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND (Trademark Infringement, Trademark Dilution, Unfair Competition, Tortious Interference with Business Relationships) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6871347), filed by Bee Extremely Amazed, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trademark Registrations) (Matasich, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bee Extremely Amazed, LLC v. BeeXtreme, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BeeXtreme, LLC
Represented By: Dominic A. Frisina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni M. Sweeney
Represented By: Dominic A. Frisina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bee Extremely Amazed, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Matasich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?