Valerio v. Chapman Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Michelle Valerio
Defendant: DJ Eddy, Chapman Corporation, Ken Oiler, Richard Nannie and Craig Whitlatch
Case Number: 2:2019cv02061
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ken Oiler on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Bean, Frederick)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Chapman Corporation, DJ Eddy, Richard Nannie, Craig Whitlatch. (Binotto, Phillip)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Chapman Corporation, DJ Eddy, Richard Nannie, Craig Whitlatch. (Binotto, Phillip)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 : Phillip J. Binotto, Jr. shall be permitted to act as trial attorney in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/8/2019. (ew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Trial Attorney for Phillip J. Binotto, Jr. by Defendant Chapman Corporation. (Smith, Nelva)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk. The Clerk of the United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, mailed a copy of the Alias Summons and Complaint via certified mail on June 25, 2019 to the following Defendant: Ken Oiler, Article Number: 7018 1130 0001 9212 1007. (mdr)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #10 and #11 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katharine Platt and Phillip Binotto, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 06/21/2019. (mdr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6976056) of Katharine L. Platt by Defendants Chapman Corporation, DJ Eddy, Richard Nannie, Craig Whitlatch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Smith, Nelva)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6976024) of Phillip J. Binotto Jr. by Defendants Chapman Corporation, DJ Eddy, Richard Nannie, Craig Whitlatch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Smith, Nelva)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nelva J Smith for Defendants Chapman Corporation, DJ Eddy, Richard Nannie, Craig Whitlatch (Smith, Nelva)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Ken Oiler (kk2)
June 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Chapman Corporation, DJ Eddy, Richard Nannie, and Craig Whitlatch answers due 7/10/2019 per #7 (Stipulation) (kk2)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Defendants Chapman Corporation, DJ Eddy, Richard Nannie, Craig Whitlatch & Plaintiff Michelle Valerio (Wahoff, William) Modified on 6/20/2019 to correct filing parties (kk2)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William John Wahoff for Defendants Chapman Corporation, DJ Eddy, Richard Nannie, Craig Whitlatch (Wahoff, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Alias Summons Oiler, #2 Supplement TS Complaint) (Bean, Frederick)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Chapman Corporation, DJ Eddy, Richard Nannie, Ken Oiler, and Craig Whitlatch served on 6/3/2019, answers due 6/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return Chapman Corp, #2 Certified Mail Receipt Return Whitlatch, #3 Certified Mail Receipt Return Eddy, #4 Certified Mail Receipt Return Oiler, #5 Certified Mail Receipt Return Nannie) (kk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named defendants via certified mail. (er)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chapman Corporation, DJ Eddy, Richard Nannie, Ken Oiler, Craig Whitlatch. (er)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Damages and Reinstatement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6932290), filed by Michelle Valerio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons x5) (Bean, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valerio v. Chapman Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJ Eddy
Represented By: Katharine L. Platt
Represented By: William John Wahoff
Represented By: Nelva J Smith
Represented By: Phillip J Binotto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman Corporation
Represented By: Katharine L. Platt
Represented By: William John Wahoff
Represented By: Nelva J Smith
Represented By: Phillip J Binotto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Oiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Nannie
Represented By: Katharine L. Platt
Represented By: William John Wahoff
Represented By: Nelva J Smith
Represented By: Phillip J Binotto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Whitlatch
Represented By: Katharine L. Platt
Represented By: William John Wahoff
Represented By: Nelva J Smith
Represented By: Phillip J Binotto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Valerio
Represented By: Frederick M Bean
Represented By: Paul Filippelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?