Miller et al v. Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack et al

Plaintiff: Mikequale Miller, Dijahn Miller, Decharia Miller, Ruth Miller, Debriana Miller, Faith Miller, Tyshajuan Miller, Nicholas Miller, Demetrais Miller, Jr., Sherry Miller, Mariellen Miller and Demetrais Miller
Defendant: Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack, Techtronic Industries Baja Motorsport, Techtronic Industries Co., Ltd. and North Eastern Technical
Case Number: 2:2019cv02083
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Techtronic Industries Baja Motorsport. Techtronic Industries Baja Motorsport served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (mdr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack. Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (mdr)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer and Objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/1/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - directing the Office of Foreign Litigation, Department of Justice to serve Defendant Techtronic Industries LTD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/27/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer & Objection by Plaintiff Mikequale Miller. New date requested 7/25/2019. (er)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to North Eastern Technical, Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack, Techtronic Industries Baja Motorsport, and Techtronic Industries Co., Ltd.. (daf)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the U.S Marshals to do serivce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/24/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING IN PART AS TO ALL PLAINTIFFS but MIKEQUALE MILLER, but REVERSED AS TO MIKEQUALUE MILLER'S CLAIM #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff Mikequalue Millers objection to the Order and Report and Recommendation is hereby SUSTAINED. However, to the extent the objections are construed against any of the other named Plaintiffs, those objections are without merit and hereby OVERRULED but REVERSED as to Mikequalue Millers claims. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 06/21/2019. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Mikequale Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (kk2)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER issued in that the Court STRIKES Plaintiffs Objection #4 , and EXTENDS the deadline by which Plaintiffs must file Objections that comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 to FOURTEEN DAYS from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 06/05/2019. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiffs Debriana Miller, Decharia Miller, Demetrais Miller, Demetrais Miller, Jr, Dijahn Miller, Faith Miller, Mariellen Miller, Mikequale Miller, Nicholas Miller, Ruth Miller, Sherry Miller and Tyshajuan Miller. OBJECTION STRIKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 06/05/19 ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (er) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (mdr). Modified on 6/6/2019 (kk).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: ECF No. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. However it is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). ( Objections to R&R due by 6/6/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/23/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against North Eastern Technical, Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack, Techtronic Industries Baja Motorsport, Techtronic Industries Co., Ltd., filed by Dijahn Miller, Faith Miller, Demetrais Miller, Mikequale Miller, Sherry Miller, Mariellen Miller, Demetrais Miller, Jr, Debriana Miller, Nicholas Miller, Tyshajuan Miller, Decharia Miller, and Ruth Miller. (daf)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiffs Debriana Miller, Decharia Miller, Demetrais Miller, Demetrais Miller, Jr, Dijahn Miller, Faith Miller, Mariellen Miller, Mikequale Miller, Nicholas Miller, Ruth Miller, Sherry Miller & Tyshajuan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summonses to be issued, #4 USM forms) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikequale Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dijahn Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Decharia Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debriana Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyshajuan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrais Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariellen Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrais Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries Baja Motorsport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Eastern Technical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?