Lan v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Bing Qing Lan
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv02246
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Kevin McAleenan and William Barr. Served on 6/12/2019. Answer due 8/12/2019. (ew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, and U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms) (ew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against William Barr and Kevin McAleenan filed by Bing Qing Lan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ew)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/5/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Bing Qing Lan. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint - Ex A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summonses to be Issued, #5 Envelope) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lan v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bing Qing Lan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?