Johnson v. Coe et al
Plaintiff: Robert W Johnson
Defendant: Joan Mahar, Jaimie Coe, Nationwide Insurance, Terry J. Griggs, Victoria Fire and Casualty Company and Dr. Richard Weiss
Case Number: 2:2019cv02428
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
2 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/5/2019. (cmw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER The Court OVERRULES Plaintiff's Objection ECF No. #9 ; Adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations ECF No. #7 . This case is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is DEEMED A VEXATIOUS LITIGATOR. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/2/2019. (cmw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendation and Recusal of Presiding Judge by Plaintiff Robert W Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (daf)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Jaimie Coe, Terry J. Griggs, Joan Mahar, Nationwide Insurance, Victoria Fire and Casualty Company, and Richard Weiss, filed by Robert W Johnson. (daf)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis are GRANTED. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS each of the above-captioned actions for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). It is further RECOMMENDED that the Court deem Plaintiff a vexatious litigator and enjoin him from filing any new actions without either (a) submitting a certification from an attorney who is licensed to practice in this Court or the State of Ohio, stating that there is a good faith basis for the claims Plaintiff seeks to assert; or (b) tendering a proposed complaint for review by this Court prior to the actual filing of the complaint in the Court's docketing system. Finally, it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff be required to include the captions and case numbers of all of his prior actions should he file a complaint in this or any other court. ( Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/23/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:19-cv-1130, 2:19-cv-2490 and 2:19-cv-2865 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Judge George C. Smith on 7/10/2019. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/25/2019. (sln)(This document sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:19-cv-1130 and 2:19-cv-2490 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Judge George C. Smith on 6/20/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson recused. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/12/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons Form, Marshal Forms, and Service Documents) by Plaintiff Robert W Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Envelope) (daf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Coe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Mahar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaimie Coe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry J. Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?