In Re: Cardinal Health, Inc. Derivative Litigation
Plaintiff: Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone and Michael Splaine
Defendant: Colleen F. Arnold, Carrie S. Cox, George S. Barrett, Bruce L. Downey, Nancy Killefer, Calvin Darden, Cardinal Health, Inc., J. Michael Losh, Michael C. Kaufmann, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Gregory B. Kenny, David P. King, David J. Anderson, Clayton M. Jones and Akhil Johri
Case Number: 2:2019cv02491
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
2 Judge: George C Smith
3 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Settlement; granting #104 Motion for Attorney Fees. This Judgment is a final, appealable judgment andshall be entered forthwith by the Clerk in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 10/4/2022. (merc)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah D. Morrison: Fairness Hearing held on 10/7/2022 re #104 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Memorandum in Support filed by Melissa Cohen, Michael Splaine, Stanley M. Malone. (Court Reporter: Allison Kimmel) (merc)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated per the Final Judgment and Order Approving Derivative Action Settlement. (merc)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. re #101 Order on Motion for Settlement, [Notice of Filing of Declaration of Albert G. Lin, Esq.] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Albert G. Lin, #2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit C to Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit D to Exhibit 1) (Lin, Albert)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine re #101 Order on Motion for Settlement, (Attachments: #1 Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli Regarding Plaintiffs' Counsel's Compliance with Paragraph 6(ii) of the Scheduling Order) (Troutman, Mark)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine re #103 MOTION for Settlement and Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Joint Declaration of Eric L Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Further Support of Final Approval of the Settlement and an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses) (Troutman, Mark)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #2 Exhibit 2 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #3 Exhibit 3 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #4 Exhibit 4 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #5 Exhibit 5 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #6 Exhibit 6 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #8 Exhibit 8 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #9 Exhibit 9 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #10 Exhibit 10 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #11 Exhibit 11 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #12 Exhibit 12 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #13 Exhibit 13 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #14 Exhibit 14 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #15 Exhibit 15 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #16 Exhibit 16 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #17 Exhibit 17 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #18 Exhibit 18 to Joint Declaration of Eric L. Zagar and Jennifer Sarnelli in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses) (Troutman, Mark)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine. (Troutman, Mark)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Settlement and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order Approving Derivative Action Settlement) (Troutman, Mark)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel Justin O. Reliford by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine (Troutman, Mark) Modified on 8/15/2022 to clarify text (kk2)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING #100 Settlement and Authorizing Dissemination of Settlement Notice. Fairness Hearing set for 10/4/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom 132 - Columbus before Judge Sarah D. Morrison. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 7/18/2022. (tb)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Troutman, Mark)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Change of Address by Shawn Kincade JudgeSEE DOCKET #99 FOR DOCUMENT (kk2)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark H Troutman (Troutman, Mark)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Defendants David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh. (Bloomfield, David)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Defendants David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh. (Bloomfield, David)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT detailing the status, but not the substance, of their settlement efforts for this case by APRIL 20, 2022, unless they have filed the submissions seeking approval of a settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 23, 2022. (jlk)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Defendants David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh. (Bloomfield, David)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 3/21/2022. (ds)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTATION ORDER - Counsel jointly notified the Court on February 4, 2022 that the case has settled. If no stipulation has been filed within forty-five days, counsel shall file a status report within that time frame. It is so ordered. Judge Sarah D. Morrison. (ds)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Change of Address by Shawn Kincade JudgeSEE DOCKET #93 FOR DOCUMENT (kk2)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark H Troutman (Troutman, Mark)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel Stacey A. Greenspan by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine (Troutman, Mark) Modified text on 12/22/2021 (kk2)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Corrected NOTICE of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel Kirsten Fraser for Individual Defendants David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia A. Hemingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, and J. Michael Losh re #90 Notice (Other) by Defendant David J. Anderson (Trafford, Robert) Modified text on 8/9/2021 (kk2).
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 DEFICIENCY NOTICE re #89 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. The subject Notice, ECF No. 89, is DEFICIENT because it was not signed by the trial attorney for the Individual Defendants. Counsel for the Individual Defendants are DIRECTED to re- file the Notice in compliance with Local Rule 83.4, and to re-file the Notice in Case No. 2:19-cv-2491 ONLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/5/2021 (jlk) Modified on 8/6/2021 to add judge signature (kk2)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #87 & #88 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lauren M. Kofke and Elizabeth N. Brandt. PHV attorneys must register through PACER for e-filing privileges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/2/2021. (er)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ( Responses due by 8/19/2021) by Defendant David J. Anderson. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (Fraser, Kirsten)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8423620) of Lauren M. Kofke by Defendants David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bloomfield, David)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8423577) of Elizabeth N. Brandt by Defendants David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bloomfield, David)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTATION ORDER granting #85 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alex B Heller and Stacey A Greenspan as co-counsel. Co-counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/28/2021. (kk2)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8421438) of Alex B. Heller, Stacey A. Greenspan by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Motion of Greenspan, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Troutman, Mark)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 15, 2021. (jlk)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER - FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 12, 2021. (jlk)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Lin, Albert)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Lin, Albert)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by J. Michael Losh. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by David P. King. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by Nancy Killefer. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by Gregory B. Kenny. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by Michael C. Kaufmann. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by Clayton M. Jones. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by Akhil Johri. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by Bruce L. Downey. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by Calvin Darden. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by Carrie S. Cox. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by George S. Barrett. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by Colleen F. Arnold. (Bloomfield, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint, filed by David J. Anderson. (Bloomfield, David)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Case is referred to Mediation in July 2022. Case referred to Clerk for assignment of mediator. Initial Disclosures due by 4/30/2021. Discovery due by 6/30/2022. Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 4/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2022. Primary Expert due by 4/15/2022. Rebuttal Expert due by 6/3/2022. Settlement Demand due by 4/15/2022. Response to Settlement Demand due by 5/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/25/2021. (ew) (Main Document 66 replaced on 3/29/2021 to correct pretrial conference date.) (ew).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #35 Amended Complaint. All Defendants shall have until April 7, 2021 to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 19, 2021. (jlk)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RULE 26(f) REPORT (Joint) by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine. (Troutman, Mark)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #35 Amended Complaint by Defendants Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh. New date requested 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) (Lin, Albert) Modified text on 3/19/2021 (kk2)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Albert Grant Lin substituting for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Lin, Albert)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #59 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to (35 in 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD) Amended Complaint. All Defendants answer due 3/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/10/2021. (er)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2021 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re (35 in 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD) Amended Complaint by Defendants David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia A. Hemingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufman, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh, David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia A. Hemingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh. New date requested 3/24/2021. ( Responses due by 3/2/2021) Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (Bloomfield, David) Modified on 2/10/2021 (kk2).
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART - Defendants' #43 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as to Count 1 and GRANTED as to Count II. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 2/8/2021. (tb)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Transcript of Oral Argument Proceedings Via Video Conference held on January 21, 2021, before Judge Sarah D. Morrison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Allison Lewis Kimmel, FAPR, RDR, CRR, CRC, Telephone number 614.719.3225. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 2/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2021. (ak)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah D. Morrison. Oral Argument held on 1/21/2021 re #43 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Court Reporter: Allison Kimmel) (tb)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING Joint #52 Motion for Permission to Appear Remotely as to #49 Notice of Hearing set for 1/21/2021 2:00 PM. By Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 1/4/2021. (tb)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTATION ORDER granting (51) in case 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, (26) in case 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, (16) in case 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anitha Reddy and Alexandra P Sadinsky as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/30/2020. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (kk2)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTATION ORDER granting (50) in case 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Savitt as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/30/2020. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (kk2)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Permission to Appear Remotely re #49 Notice of Hearing on Motion, by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine & All Defendants. (Troutman, Mark) Modified on 1/4/2021 (kk2)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7908378) of Anitha Reddy, Alexandra P. Sadinsky( Responses due by 1/13/2021) by Defendants David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia Hemmingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh, and Cardinal Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Motion of Sadinsky, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (Bloomfield, David) Modified parties on 12/29/2020 (kk2)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7908371) of William Savitt by Defendants Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bloomfield, David)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Oral Argument set for 1/21/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom 148 (Judge Smith's Courtroom) - Columbus before Judge Sarah D. Morrison (counsel to appear in person). (tb)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re (43 in 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia A. Hemingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufman, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh, David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia A. Hemingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (Bloomfield, David)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine. (Troutman, Mark)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTATION ORDER granting (45) in case 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD; granting (23) in case 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD; and granting (13) in case 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Justin O Reliford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/27/2020. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (kk2)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7572353) of Justin O. Reliford (Responses due by 8/14/2020) by Plaintiffs Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone, Michael Splaine. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (Troutman, Mark)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Plaintiffs Michael Splaine, Melissa Cohen, Stanley M. Malone Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (Troutman, Mark) Modified text on 7/21/2020 (kk2)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (2008 DEA Agreement), #2 Exhibit 2 (2012 DEA Agreement), #3 Exhibit 3 (2016 DEA Agreement), #4 Exhibit 4 (Himmel Complaint), #5 Exhibit 5 (Stanley Complaint), #6 Exhibit 6 (Consent Order, US v Kinray), #7 Exhibit 7 (US v Kinray Complaint), #8 Exhibit 8 (West Virginia Complaint), #9 Exhibit 9 (West Virginia Agreement)) (Bloomfield, David)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Continue. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for June 23, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. (ECF No. 40) is hereby VACATED. The Court will reschedule the conference following disposition of the forthcoming motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 8, 2020. (jlk)
June 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for June 23, 2020 by Defendants Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh & All Plaintiffs. (Bloomfield, David) Modified filing parties on 6/8/2020 (kk2)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2020 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (This document filed in LEAD CASE ONLY pursuant to the 1/28/2019 Order #31 - *** HEREINAFTER, ALL DOCUMENTS SHALL ONLY BE FILED IN 2:19-cv-2491.*** (sln)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting (38) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD. Defendants shall file their answer(s), motion(s) to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint on or before Friday, June 19, 2020. If Defendants file motion(s) to dismiss or other motion(s), Plaintiffs shall file any opposition brief on or before Tuesday, August 4, 2020, and Defendants shall file any reply brief(s) on or before Friday, September 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 9, 2020. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (jlk)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive motions due by 6/19/2020. Responses due by 8/4/2020. Replies due by 9/18/2020. (jlk)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants Answer due by 6/19/20. (jlk)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Schedule for Responding to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint ( Responses due by 4/8/2020) by Defendants David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia A. Hemingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufman, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh, David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia A. Hemingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh. New date requested 6/19/2020. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (Bloomfield, David) Modified text on 4/9/2020 (kk2)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting (36) Joint Motion to Establish a Schedule for Responding to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint in case 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD; Granting (18) in case 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD; Granting (8) in case 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD. Dfts shall file their responses to Consolidated Complaint by 5/15/2020. If Dfts file motion(s) to dismiss or other motion(s), Plts shall file any opposition brief by 6/30/2020, and Dfts shall file any reply brief(s) by 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/19/2020. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (sln)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines - Responses to Consolidated Complaint due by 5/15/2020. (sln)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Joint MOTION Establish case schedule for responding to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint re (35 in 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD) Amended Complaint, (34 in 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD) Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, ( Responses due by 5/15/2020) by Defendants David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia A. Hemingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufman, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh, David J. Anderson, Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia A. Hemingway Hall, Akhil Johri, Clayton M. Jones, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, David P. King, J. Michael Losh. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (Bloomfield, David)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Splaine, Stanley M. Malone, Melissa Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Melissa Cohen Verification for Consol. Complaint, #2 Michael Splaine Verification for Cons. Complaint, #3 Stanley Malone Verification for Consol. Complaint)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (Troutman, Mark)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting (32) Motion to Appoint a Leadership Structure in case 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD; granting (15) Motion to Appoint a Leadership Structure in case 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD; granting (5) Motion to Appoint a Leadership Structure in case 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 2/11/2020. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (tb)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint due by 3/12/2020. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (tb)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTATION ORDER finding as moot #20 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to the agreement of counsel and the filing of #25 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 2/10/2020. (tb)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Motion to Appoint a Leadership Structure ( Responses due by 2/28/2020) by Plaintiffs Michael Splaine, Stanley M. Malone, and Melissa Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Declaration of Michael C. Wagner, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD, 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD, 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD (Troutman, Mark) Modified filing parties on 2/10/2020 (kk2)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting (30) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:19-cv-02491-SDM-EPD; granting (12) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:19-cv-05442-SDM-EPD; granting (3) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:20-cv-00203-SDM-EPD. *** HEREINAFTER, ALL DOCUMENTS SHALL ONLY BE FILED IN 2:19-cv-2491.*** Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison and Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. on 1/28/20. (sem)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Set Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Cross-Motions to Appoint a Leadership Structure by Plaintiff Melissa Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wayne, Richard)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Joint Motion to Establish Schedule for Responding to #25 Amended Complaint - Answer(s), motion(s) to dismiss, or other responses due by 2/24/2020. If a motion to dismiss or other motion is filed, plaintiff's opposition due by 3/31/2020 & defendants' replies due by 5/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/23/2019. (kk2)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint MOTION Establish Schedule for Responding to Plaintiff's #25 Amended Complaint by Defendants Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh & Plaintiff Melissa Cohen (Bloomfield, David) Modified text & filing parties on 12/23/2019 (kk2)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:19-cv-5442 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah D. Morrison and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge George C. Smith & Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 12/20/2019. (kk2)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED Complaint (Re: #1 Complaint) by Plaintiff Melissa Cohen. Amended Verified Complaint. (Wayne, Richard) Modified text and created linkage to the original complaint on 12/9/2019 (mdr).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTATION ORDER granting #23 Motion Unopposed MOTION MODIFY PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Plaintiff shall file amended or supplemental complaint on or before December 6, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/24/2019. (agm)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/6/2019. (agm)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION MODIFY PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Plaintiff Melissa Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wayne, Richard)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The parties' Joint Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference is GRANTED (ECF No. #22 ). The parties are directed to file a proposed case schedule, if appropriate, the earlier of 6 months from the date of this Order or 21 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/30/2019. (daf)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for October 9, 2019 by Defendants Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh. (Bloomfield, David)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (2008 DEA Agreement), #2 Exhibit 2 (2012 DEA Agreement), #3 Exhibit 3 (2016 DEA Agreement), #4 Exhibit 4 (Consent Order, US v. Kinray), #5 Exhibit 5 (Complaint, US v. Kinray), #6 Exhibit 6 (Complaint, WV v. Cardinal Health), #7 Exhibit 7 (WV Agreement), #8 Exhibit 8 (Complaint, Himmel v. Barrett), #9 Exhibit 9 (Complaint, Stanley v. Arnold), #10 Exhibit 10 (Complaint, Erste), #11 Exhibit 11 (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order, Erste), #12 Exhibit 12 (Third Amended Complaint (Summit County)), #13 Exhibit 13 (Third Amended Complaint (Cuyahoga County)), #14 Exhibit 14 (First Amended Complaint, NY v. Purdue), #15 Exhibit 15 (Report of Special Demand Committee)) (Bloomfield, David)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond and Proposed Schedule for Briefing. Defendants shall file their answers, motions to dismiss, or otherwise respond in this action on or before Friday, September 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/23/2019. (daf)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. (daf)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/20/2019. to Answer or Respond and Proposed Schedule for Briefing by Defendants Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh. (Bloomfield, David)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Nancy Killefer on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael C. Kaufmann on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to J. Michael Losh on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Gregory B. Kenny on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to George S. Barrett on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Colleen F. Arnold on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Carrie S. Cox on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Cardinal Health, Inc. on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Calvin Darden on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Bruce L. Downey on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sarnelli, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER granting #4 and #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Sarnelli and James S. Notis filed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 07/03/2019. (mdr)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6994288) of James Stuart Notis by Plaintiff Melissa Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wayne, Richard)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6994259) of Jennifer Sarnelli by Plaintiff Melissa Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wayne, Richard)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Jennifer Sarnelli (kk2)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney James S Notis (kk2)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Colleen F. Arnold, George S. Barrett, Cardinal Health, Inc., Carrie S. Cox, Calvin Darden, Bruce L. Downey, Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall, Michael C. Kaufmann, Gregory B. Kenny, Nancy Killefer, J. Michael Losh ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6968013), filed by Melissa Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wayne, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Cardinal Health, Inc. Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen F. Arnold
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: William Savitt
Represented By: Anitha Reddy
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Alexandra Paige Sadinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie S. Cox
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: William Savitt
Represented By: Anitha Reddy
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Alexandra Paige Sadinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George S. Barrett
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: William Savitt
Represented By: Anitha Reddy
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Alexandra Paige Sadinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce L. Downey
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: William Savitt
Represented By: Anitha Reddy
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Alexandra Paige Sadinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Killefer
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: William Savitt
Represented By: Anitha Reddy
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Alexandra Paige Sadinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Darden
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: William Savitt
Represented By: Anitha Reddy
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Alexandra Paige Sadinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Erika Dackin Prouty
Represented By: William Savitt
Represented By: Marissa Anne Peirsol
Represented By: Anitha Reddy
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Albert Grant Lin
Represented By: Alexandra Paige Sadinsky
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Michael Losh
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: William Savitt
Represented By: Anitha Reddy
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Alexandra Paige Sadinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Kaufmann
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: William Savitt
Represented By: Anitha Reddy
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Alexandra Paige Sadinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia S. Hemmingway Hall
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: William Savitt
Represented By: Anitha Reddy
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Alexandra Paige Sadinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory B. Kenny
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: William Savitt
Represented By: Anitha Reddy
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Alexandra Paige Sadinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. King
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Anderson
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton M. Jones
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akhil Johri
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Brandt
Represented By: Lauren M. Kofke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Cohen
Represented By: Richard Stuart Wayne
Represented By: Jennifer Sarnelli
Represented By: William Kendall Flynn
Represented By: Robert R Sparks
Represented By: James S Notis
Represented By: Mark H Troutman
Represented By: Justin Oliver Reliford
Represented By: Alex B. Heller
Represented By: Stacey Andrea Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley M. Malone
Represented By: Christopher M Windover
Represented By: Eric Zagar
Represented By: Michael C Wagner
Represented By: Shawn Kincade Judge
Represented By: Mark H Troutman
Represented By: Justin Oliver Reliford
Represented By: Alex B. Heller
Represented By: Stacey Andrea Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Splaine
Represented By: Christopher M Windover
Represented By: Eric Zagar
Represented By: Michael C Wagner
Represented By: Shawn Kincade Judge
Represented By: Mark H Troutman
Represented By: Justin Oliver Reliford
Represented By: Alex B. Heller
Represented By: Stacey Andrea Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?