Rocky Brands, Inc. v. Euron Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rocky Brands, Inc.
Defendant: Euron Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02547
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Euron Group, Inc. answer due 8/1/2019. (er)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Euron Group, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Yurkiw, Jay) Modified party served on 7/22/2019 (er).
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Euron Group, Inc.. (jlk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Rocky Brands, Inc. (Yurkiw, Jay)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Euron Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6973781), filed by Rocky Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Yurkiw, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Brands, Inc. v. Euron Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euron Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Martin J Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?