Billiter v. OSU Wexner Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Fred L. Billiter, Jr.
Defendant: OSU Wexner Medical Center, Dr. Anghela Z. Paredes and Dr. Daniel Vazquez
Case Number: 2:2019cv02550
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of letter filed in Case No. 19-cv-715 by Plaintiff Fred L. Billiter, Jr (mdr)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Order signed by Judge George C. Smith on 08/05/2019. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING REPORT and RECOMMENDATION #3 . This Court finds that Plaintiff's Objections are without merit and are hereby OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation and Order, Document #3 , is ADOPTED and AFFIRMED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 08/05/2019. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Fred L. Billiter, Jr. (mdr)
July 2, 2019 Set Deadlines: Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2019 (ew)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER: Magistrate Judge GRANTS #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, RECOMMENDS dismissing without prejudice #2 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/2/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against OSU Wexner Medical Center, Daniel Vazquez, and Anghela Z. Paredes filed by Fred L. Billiter, Jr. (ew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: properly completed summons forms) by Plaintiff Fred L. Billiter, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint - OSU Wexner Medical Center, #3 Complaint - Vazquez, #4 Complaint - Parades, #5 Summons Forms, #6 USM285 - OSU Wexner Medical Center, #7 USM285 - Vazquez, #8 USM285 - Parades, #9 Envelope) (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billiter v. OSU Wexner Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred L. Billiter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSU Wexner Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Anghela Z. Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Daniel Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?