Ferguson et al v. Davol, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jacquline Ferguson and Edward Ferguson
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon Inc, C.R. Bard Inc. and Davol, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02664
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Ethicon Inc. (Maimbourg, Rita)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Maimbourg, Rita)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Short Form ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by C.R. Bard Inc., Davol, Inc.. (Kloss, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ethicon Inc. Ethicon Inc served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Preston, A.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Johnson & Johnson. Johnson & Johnson served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Preston, A.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ethicon Inc, and Johnson & Johnson. (daf)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Preston, A.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Preston, A.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Renee Preston for Plaintiffs Edward Ferguson, Jacquline Ferguson (Preston, A.)
June 24, 2019 Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. (daf)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00377. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Southern District of Ohio. (VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 6/24/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Southern District of Ohio. (VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 6/24/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 6/24/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc., Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3998040), filed by Jacquline Ferguson, Edward Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 6/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson et al v. Davol, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquline Ferguson
Represented By: Timothy M. O'Brien
Represented By: A. Renee Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Ferguson
Represented By: Timothy M. O'Brien
Represented By: A. Renee Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Rita A Maimbourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Rita A Maimbourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard Inc.
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol, Inc.
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?